Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2713389

EP2713389 - System and method of novel MX to MX-2 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.09.2017  [2017/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
STMicroelectronics, Inc.
750 Canyon Drive, Suite 300
Coppell, TX 75019 / US
For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, New York 10504 / US
[2017/03]
Former [2014/14]For all designated states
STMicroelectronics, Inc.
750 Canyon Drive, Suite 300
Coppell, TX 75019 / US
For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk
New York, N.Y. 10504 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Zhang, John H
123 Twenty West Drive
Altamont, NY New York 12009 / US
02 / Clevenger, Lawrence A
90 Andrews Road
La Grangeville, NY New York 12540 / US
03 / Radens, Carl
35 Kuchler Drive
La Grangeville, NY New York 12540 / US
04 / Xu, Yiheng
12 Fanore Court
Hopewell Junction, NY New York 12533 / US
 [2014/14]
Representative(s)Style, Kelda Camilla Karen
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/14]Style, Kelda Camilla Karen
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date13184856.617.09.2013
[2014/14]
Priority number, dateUS20121362940227.09.2012         Original published format: US201213629402
[2014/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2713389
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/768
[2014/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/14]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren für neuartiges MX zu MX-2[2014/14]
English:System and method of novel MX to MX-2[2014/14]
French:Système et procédé de nouveau MX à MX-2[2014/14]
Examination procedure01.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/37]
10.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201604   M06   Not yet paid