Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2819404

EP2819404 - Video processing system, and video processing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.06.2015
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.07.2015  [2015/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
[2015/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Kataoka, Satoshi
c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Property
Division
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/01]Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date13184946.518.09.2013
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateUS20131392693625.06.2013         Original published format: US201313926936
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2819404
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/01
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Videoverarbeitungssystem und Videoverarbeitungsverfahren[2015/01]
English:Video processing system, and video processing method[2015/01]
French:Système de traitement vidéo et procédé de traitement vidéo[2015/01]
Examination procedure18.09.2013Examination requested  [2015/01]
01.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.06.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/29]
Documents cited:Search[I]US2010079666  (OSANAI TAKASHI [JP]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0066]; figures 1-4 *;
 [I]US2010053425  (OKUMOTO HIDEAKI [JP]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0066]; figures 2-5 *;
 [A]US2011280543  (UCHIDA KOSUKE [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2007310837
 JP2008098803
 JP2000188680