Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2713596

EP2713596 - IMAGE EVALUATION DEVICE, IMAGE EVALUATION METHOD AND PROGRAM STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/14]Image evaluation device, image evaluation method and program storage medium
[2019/49]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.01.2020
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.02.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020(Expected) grantpublished on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fujifilm Corporation
26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2020/09]
Former [2014/14]For all designated states
Fujifilm Corporation
26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMAGISHI, Hideki
c/o FUJIFILM Corporation
798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi
Ashigarakami-gun
Kanagawa / JP
[2020/09]
Former [2014/14]01 / Yamagishi, Hideki
c/o FUJIFILM Corporation
798, Miyanodai, Kaisei-machi
Ashigarakami-gun
Kanagawa / JP
Representative(s)Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[2020/09]
Former [2014/14]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date13185383.020.09.2013
[2014/14]
Priority number, dateJP2012021871028.09.2012         Original published format: JP 2012218710
[2014/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2713596
Date:02.04.2014
Language:EN
[2014/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2713596
Date:28.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Type: B1  Patent specification
No.:EP2713596
Date:26.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/00, G06T7/00
[2017/52]
Former International [2014/14]H04N1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/43]
Former [2014/14]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:BILDBEURTEILUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDBEURTEILUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMMSPEICHERMEDIUM[2019/49]
English:IMAGE EVALUATION DEVICE, IMAGE EVALUATION METHOD AND PROGRAM STORAGE MEDIUM[2019/49]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION D'IMAGE, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE DE PROGRAMME[2019/49]
Former [2014/14]Bildbeurteilungsvorrichtung, Bildbeurteilungsverfahren und Programmspeichermedium
Former [2014/14]Image evaluation device, image evaluation method and program storage medium
Former [2014/14]Dispositif et procédé d'évaluation d'image, support de stockage de programme
Examination procedure20.09.2013Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.09.2018Examination requested  [2018/43]
25.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.01.2020Fee for grant paid
15.01.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.01.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.02.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[IA]US2010245941  (KASAI TSUNEO [JP], et al) [I] 1-3,10-14,23,28,31,32 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1-13 * [A] 4,15-19;
 [IA]US2008013848  (WU WENCHENG [US], et al) [I] 1-3,10-15,23,28,31,32 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0082]; figures 1-4 * [A] 4,16-19;
 [IA]  - JING XIAOCHEN ET AL, "Masking mediated print defect visibility predictor", IMAGE QUALITY AND SYSTEM PERFORMANCE IX, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20120122), vol. 8293, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.911912, pages 1 - 11, XP060000946 [I] 1-4,10-16,23,28,31,32 * pages 82930R-1 - pages 82930R-6; figures 1,3 * [A] 17-19

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.911912
 [A]  - RAFAT MANTIUK ET AL, "HDR-VDP-2 : a calibrated visual metric for visibility and quality predictions in all luminance conditions", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS (TOG), US, (20110701), vol. 30, no. 4, doi:10.1145/2010324.1964935, ISSN 0730-0301, page 1, XP055422545 [A] 1,4,16-19,31,32 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2010324.1964935
 [A]  - DALY S, "THE VISIBLE DIFFERENCES PREDICTOR: AN ALGORITHM FOR THE ASSESSMENT OF IMAGE FIDELITY", OPTOMECHATRONIC MICRO/NANO DEVICES AND COMPONENTS III : 8 - 10 OCTOBER 2007, LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND;PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WASH, (19920101), vol. 1666, doi:10.1117/12.135952, ISBN 978-1-62841-730-2, pages 2 - 15, XP000917168 [A] 1,4,16-19,31,32 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.135952
 [A]  - Hila Nachlieli, "Automatic Mechanical-Band Perceptual Evaluation", (20090101), URL: http://docserver.ingentaconnect.com/deliver/connect/ist/21694451/v2009n2/s26.pdf?expires=1510562185&id=0000&titleid=72010410&checksum=D464740DD3ADC10C496CBDDA85CE3692, (20171113), XP055423997 [A] 1,4,16-19,31,32 * Section "Analysis"; page 496 - page 497 *
by applicantJP2007033247
 JP2006139777