blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2679612

EP2679612 - Distannoxane catalysts for polyamides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.04.2016
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2014/01]
Inventor(s)01 / Timmers, Francis, J.
4605 Lund Drive
Midland, MI Michigan 48642 / US
02 / Chaudhary, Bharat, I.
14 Michelle Court
Princeton, NJ New Jersey 08540 / US
03 / Mullins, Michael, J.
302 Juniper
Lake Jackson, TX Texas 77566 / US
04 / Kuhlman, Roger, L.
117 Dewberry
Lake Jackson, TX Texas 77566 / US
 [2014/01]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/01]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date13185606.425.08.2006
[2014/01]
Priority number, dateUS20050716767P13.09.2005         Original published format: US 716767 P
[2014/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2679612
Date:01.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2679612
Date:03.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2013
ClassificationIPC:C08F255/04, C08K5/57, C08L23/08, C08G18/24, C08G69/00, H01B3/30, H01B3/46
[2014/01]
CPC:
C08F255/02 (EP,US); C08F255/04 (EP,US); C08G18/242 (EP,US);
C08K5/57 (EP,US); C08L23/08 (EP,US); C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US); H01B3/308 (US); H01B3/441 (EP,US);
C08L2203/202 (EP,US); C08L23/0892 (EP,US); C08L2312/08 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2933 (EP,US); Y10T428/294 (EP,US); Y10T428/2947 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C08F255/02, C08F230/085 (EP,US);
C08K5/57, C08L43/04 (US,EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L23/08, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L51/06, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
(-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2015/23]
Former [2014/01]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Distannoxankatalysatoren für Polyamide[2014/01]
English:Distannoxane catalysts for polyamides[2014/01]
French:Catalyseurs à base de distannoxane pour des polyamides[2014/01]
Examination procedure04.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/29]
16.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.04.2015Fee for grant paid
22.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06790005.0  / EP1934270
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060790005) is  13.09.2011
Opposition(s)04.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
23.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
13.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.08.2006
AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
TR03.06.2015
IE25.08.2015
LU25.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GB03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
[2018/33]
Former [2017/39]HU25.08.2006
AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CY03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
NL03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
IE25.08.2015
LU25.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GB03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2017/03]AT03.06.2015
BE03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
IE25.08.2015
LU25.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GB03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/34]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
IE25.08.2015
LU25.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GB03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/33]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
IE25.08.2015
LU25.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/24]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SI03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
LU25.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/22]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
LU25.08.2015
CH31.08.2015
LI31.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/20]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
DK03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
LU25.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/18]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
MC03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
LU25.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/17]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
LU25.08.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/10]AT03.06.2015
CZ03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
PL03.06.2015
RO03.06.2015
SK03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
IS03.10.2015
PT06.10.2015
Former [2016/09]AT03.06.2015
EE03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT03.06.2015
ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
BG03.09.2015
GR04.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES03.06.2015
FI03.06.2015
LT03.06.2015
LV03.06.2015
GR04.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US4206098  (KWIECINSKI JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * example 7 *;
 [A]US5244982  (GONDARD CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 9, line 27 * * table 9 * * column 14, line 52 - line 60 *;
 [X]JP2001335633  (DAICEL CHEM) [X] 1-10* paragraph [0003]; claims 1-3 *
by applicantUS4076698
 US4950541
 US6005055
 WO0212354
 WO0212355
    - Polypropylene Handbook: Polymerization, Characterization, Properties, Processing, Applications, (1996), vol. 3-14, pages 113 - 176
    - JOURNAL OF CELLULAR PLASTICS, (200209), vol. 38, pages 421 - 440
    - Modem Plastics Encyclopedia/89, (198810), vol. 65, pages 264 - 268
    - INTRODUCTION TO INJECTION MOLDING, pages 270 - 271
    - "Extrusion-Blow Molding", Modem Plastics Encyclopedia/89, (198810), vol. 65, pages 217 - 218
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.