Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2853863

EP2853863 - Sensor with an access element for its housing [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/14]Access element for a housing of a sensor and sensor with a corresponding access element
[2016/46]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.01.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAUMER ELECTRIC AG
Hummelstrasse 17
8500 Frauenfeld / CH
[2015/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Hohl, Michael
Baumer Electric AG
Helmweg 28
8405 Winterthur / CH
 [2015/14]
Representative(s)Strauss, Steffen
Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 Group Intellectual Property
8501 Frauenfeld / CH
[2015/14]
Application number, filing date13185881.325.09.2013
[2015/14]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2853863
Date:01.04.2015
Language:DE
[2015/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2853863
Date:01.03.2017
Language:DE
[2017/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01D11/24, H05K5/06
[2015/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/46]
Former [2015/14]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Sensor mit einem Zugangselement für dessen Gehäuse[2016/46]
English:Sensor with an access element for its housing[2016/46]
French:Capteur comprenant un élément d'accès pour son boîtier[2016/46]
Former [2015/14]Zugangselement für ein Gehäuse eines Sensors und Sensor mit einem entsprechenden Zugangselement
Former [2015/14]Access element for a housing of a sensor and sensor with a corresponding access element
Former [2015/14]Elément d'accès pour le boîtier d'un capteur et capteur comprenant un élément d'accès correspondant
Examination procedure01.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2015Examination requested  [2015/46]
17.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.01.2017Fee for grant paid
17.01.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.01.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.11.2016
Opposition(s)04.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.09.2013
CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
MT01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
IE25.09.2017
LU25.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
MT01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
IE25.09.2017
LU25.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
Former [2018/39]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
IE25.09.2017
LU25.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
Former [2018/34]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
IE25.09.2017
LU25.09.2017
Former [2018/29]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
MC01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SI01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2018/09]CZ01.03.2017
DK01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
SM01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
PT03.07.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
PL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ01.03.2017
EE01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
IT01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RO01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
SK01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
IS01.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ01.03.2017
ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Former [2017/41]ES01.03.2017
FI01.03.2017
HR01.03.2017
LT01.03.2017
LV01.03.2017
NL01.03.2017
RS01.03.2017
SE01.03.2017
BG01.06.2017
NO01.06.2017
GR02.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE2943082  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,3 * page 4, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph 3; figure 1 * [I] 9,11-12,14;
 [XI]DE8415992U  (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [X] 1,3 * page 3, paragraph l - page 5, paragraph l; figure 1 * [I] 9,11-12,14;
 [XI]DE8202016U  (BRUST, EGON) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * page 12, paragraph l; figure 5 * [I] 9,13-14;
 [A]EP2615892  (HYDRELIS [FR]) [A] 9-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0023]; figure 1 *
ExaminationEP2461137
by applicantEP2461137
 EP2461138