Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2706065

EP2706065 - Expression cassettes derived from maize [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
[2016/51]
Former [2014/11]For all designated states
Syngenta Participations AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Nuccio, Michael
Syngenta Biotechnology, Inc.
RDRD Agronomic Traits
3054 East Cornwallis Road
Durham, NC 27709 / US
 [2014/11]
Representative(s)SYNGENTA IP
WRO B8-Z1-30
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2016/51]Syngenta International AG
WRO B8-Z1-30
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2014/18]Syngenta International AG
WRO 1008-Z1-26
Schwarzwaldalle 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2014/11]Scharrenberg, Christian
Syngenta International AG
Intellectual Property
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date13186886.108.06.2010
[2014/11]
Priority number, dateUS20090186038P11.06.2009         Original published format: US 186038 P
[2014/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2706065
Date:12.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2706065
Date:21.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/82, C07K14/415
[2016/32]
Former International [2014/11]C07H21/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/11]
TitleGerman:Aus Maische abgeleitete Expressionskassetten[2014/11]
English:Expression cassettes derived from maize[2014/11]
French:Cassettes d'expression dérivées du maïs[2014/11]
Examination procedure01.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/11]
12.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.11.2016Fee for grant paid
08.11.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10786648.5  / EP2440565
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.03.2015
Opposition(s)22.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
09.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
05.06.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
07.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.06.2010
AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CY21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
MK21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
IE08.06.2017
IT08.06.2017
LU08.06.2017
MT08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU08.06.2010
AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CY21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
IE08.06.2017
IT08.06.2017
LU08.06.2017
MT08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2019/31]HU08.06.2010
AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
IE08.06.2017
IT08.06.2017
LU08.06.2017
MT08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/43]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
IE08.06.2017
IT08.06.2017
LU08.06.2017
MT08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/28]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
IE08.06.2017
IT08.06.2017
LU08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/21]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
LU08.06.2017
CH30.06.2017
LI30.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/11]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/01]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
Former [2017/31]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV21.12.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0342926  (LUBRIZOL GENETICS INC [US]) [X] 1 * claims 1-12; sequences 8, 13 * [I] 2-20;
 [XI]US2004034888  (LIU JINGDONG [US] ET AL) [X] 1 * claim 1; sequence 5778 * [I] 2-20;
 [I]WO2004081217  (BASF PLANT SCIENCE GMBH [DE]; FRANK MARKUS [DE]; KOGEL KARL-HEINZ [DE]) [I] 1-20 * sequence 33 *
 [I]  - TOKI SEIICHI ET AL, "Expression of a maize ubiquitin gene promoter-bar chimeric gene in transgenic rice plants", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (19920401), vol. 100, no. 3, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 1503 - 1507, XP002213880 [I] 1-20 * the whole document *
 [I]  - CHRISTENSEN A H ET AL, "MAIZE POLYUBIQUITIN GENES: STRUCTURE, THERMAL PERTURBATION OF EXPRESSION AND TRANSCRIPT SPLICING, AND PROMOTER ACTIVITY FOLLOWING TRANSFER TO PROTOPLASTS BY ELECTROPORATION", PLANT MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT, NL, (19920101), vol. 18, no. 4, doi:10.1007/BF00020010, ISSN 0167-4412, pages 675 - 689, XP009002808 [I] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00020010
 [I]  - CHRISTENSEN A H ET AL, "UBIQUITIN PROMOTER-BASED VECTORS FOR HIGH-LEVEL EXPRESSION OF SELECTABLE AND/OR SCREENABLE MARKER GENES IN MONOCOTYLEDONOUS PLANTS", TRANSGENIC RESEARCH, LONDON, GB, (19960101), vol. 5, no. 3, doi:10.1007/BF01969712, ISSN 0962-8819, pages 213 - 218, XP000876759 [I] 1-20 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01969712
 [I]  - KANG TAE-JIN ET AL, "Comparing constitutive promoters using CAT activity in transgenic tobacco plants", MOLECULES AND CELLS, SEOUL, KR, (20030831), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 1016-8478, pages 117 - 122, XP002476849 [I] 1-20 * abstract *
 [X]  - "Zea mays chromosome 4 clone CH201-484J12, *** SEQUENCING IN PROGRESS ***, 8 unordered pieces.", EMBL, (20061230), Database accession no. AC196154, URL: EBI, XP002719175 [X] 1 * sequence . *
Examination   - "polyubiquitin [maize, Genomic, 3439 nt].", EMBL, (19930216), Database accession no. S94466, URL: EBI
    - "Zea mays polyubiquitin (MubC5) mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (19950719), Database accession no. U29158, URL: EBI
by applicantUS5366892
 US5747450
 US5737514
 US5723756
 US5593881
 US6037522
 US6051409
 US5004863
 US5159135
 US5569834
 US5416011
 US5463174
 US2007006344
    - KOMAMYTSKY; BORISJUK, GENETIC ENGINEERING, (2003), vol. 25, pages 113 - 141
    - EBERT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 5745 - 5749
    - LAWTON ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 9, pages 315 - 324
    - ODELL ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, pages 810 - 812
    - SANGER ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 14, page 43343
    - PELLEGRINESCHI ET AL., BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (1995), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 247 - 250
    - WALKER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 6624 - 66280
    - YANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 414 - 44148
    - CHANDLER ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, pages 1175 - 1183
    - BATZER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 5081
    - OHTSUKA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, pages 2605 - 2608
    - ROSSOLINI ET AL., MOL. CELL. PROBES, (1994), vol. 8, pages 91 - 98
    - INGELBRECHT ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, pages 671 - 680
    - GEISER ET AL., GENE, (1986), vol. 48, page 109
    - DAMME ET AL., PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 24, page 825
    - CASTLE ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 304, pages 1151 - 1154
    - CHENG ET AL., PLANT CELL REP., (1997), vol. 15, pages 971 - 980
    - CHENG ET AL., PLANT CELL REP., (1996), vol. 15, pages 653 - 657
    - MCKENTLY ET AL., PLANT CELL REP., (1995), vol. 14, pages 699 - 703
    - NEWELL, C. A., MOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 16, pages 53 - 65
    - BIRREN ET AL., In Genome Analysis: Detecting Genes, COLD SPRING HARBOR, (1998), vol. 1
    - BIRREN ET AL., In Genome Analysis: Analyzing DNA, COLD SPRING HARBOR, (1998), vol. 2
    - JONES ET AL., EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, pages 2411 - 2418
    - DE ALMEIDA ET AL., MOL. GEN. GENETICS, (1989), vol. 218, pages 78 - 86
    - IYER M.; WU L. ET AL., "Two step transcriptional amplification as a method for imaging reporter gene expression using weak promoters", PNAS, (2001), vol. 98, no. 25, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.251551098, pages 14595 - 14600, XP055215119

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.251551098
    - LARKIN, J.C.; OPPENHEIMER, D.G.; POLLOCK, S.; MARKS, M.D., "Arabidopsis GLABROUS gene requires downstream sequences for function", PLANT CELL, (1993), vol. 5, no. 12, pages 1739 - 1748
    - SIEBURTH, L.E.; MEYEROWITZ, E.M., "Molecular dissection of the AGAMOUS control region shows that cis elements for spatial regulation are located intragenically", PLANT CELL, (1997), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 355 - 365, XP003012818
    - BATZER ET AL., "Enhanced evolutionary PCR using oligonucleotides with inosine at the 3'- terminus", NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 5081, XP000606380
    - OHTSUKA ET AL., "An alternative approach to deoxyoligonucleotides as hybridization probes by insertion of deoxyinosine at ambiguous codon positions", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, pages 2605 - 2608, XP002031938
    - ROSSOLINI ET AL., "Use of deoxyinosine-containing primers vs degenerate primers for polymerase chain reaction based on ambiguous sequence information", MOL. CELL PROBES, (1994), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1006/mcpr.1994.1013, pages 91 - 98, XP024798443

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mcpr.1994.1013
    - PASZKOWSKI ET AL., "Direct Gene Transfer to Plants", EMBO J, (1984), vol. 3, pages 2717 - 2722, XP008028852
    - POTRYKUS ET AL., "Molecular and general genetics of a hybrid foreign gene introduced into tobacco by direct gene transfer", MOL. GEN. GENET., (1985), vol. 199, pages 169 - 177
    - REICH ET AL., "Efficient transformation of alfalfa protoplasts by the intranuclear microinjection of Ti-plasmids", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1986), vol. 4, pages 1001 - 1004
    - KLEIN ET AL., "High velocity microprojectiles for delivering nucleic acids into living cells", NATURE, (1987), vol. 327, pages 70 - 73
    - UKNES ET AL., "Regulation of pathogenesis-related protein-la gene expression in tobacco", PLANT CELL, (1993), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1105/tpc.5.2.159, pages 159 - 169, XP001055297

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.5.2.159
    - HOFGEN, R; WILLMITZER, L, "Storage of competent cells for Agrobacterium transformation", NUCL. ACID RES., (1988), vol. 16, page 9877
    - SCHOCHER ET AL., "Co-transformation of foreign genes into plants", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1986), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1286-1093, pages 1093 - 1096, XP009148958

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1286-1093
    - GORDON-KAMM ET AL., "Transformation of Maize Cells and Regeneration of Fertile Transgenic Plants", PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1105/tpc.2.7.603, pages 603 - 618, XP002059217

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1105/tpc.2.7.603
    - FROMM ET AL., "Inheritance and expression of chimeric genes in the progeny of transgenic maize plants", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1990), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0990-833, pages 833 - 839, XP002910122

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0990-833
    - KOZIEL ET AL., "Field performance of elite transgenic maize plants expressing an insecticidal protein derived from Bacillus thuringiensis", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0293-194, pages 194 - 200, XP002029715

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0293-194
    - VASIL ET AL., "Herbicide resistant fertile transgenic wheat plants obtained by microprojectile bombardment ofregenerable embryogenic callus", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 10, pages 667 - 674
    - VASIL ET AL., "Rapid production of transgenic plants by direct bombardment of cultured immature embryos", BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1993), vol. 11, pages 1553 - 1558, XP000590888
    - WEEKS ET AL., "Rapid Production of Multiple Independent Lines of Fertile Transgenic Wheat (Triticum aestivum", PLANT PHYSIOL., (1993), vol. 1102, pages 1077 - 1084
    - MURASHIGA ET AL., "A revised medium for rapid growth and bio-essays with tobacco tissue cultures", PHYSIOLOGIA PLANTARUM, (1962), vol. 15, pages 473 - 497
    - NEGROTTO ET AL., "The use of phosphomannose isomerase as a selectable marker to recover transgenic maize plants (Zea mays L.) via Agrobacterium transformation", PLANT CELL REPORTS, (2000), vol. 19, pages 798 - 803
    - EASTMOND, P.J.; VAN DIJKEN, A.J.H.; SPIELMAN, M.; KERR, A.; TISSIER, A.F.; DICKINSON, H.G.; JONES, J.D.G.; SMEEKENS, S.C.; GRAHAM,, "Trehalose-6-phosphate synthase 1, which catalyses the first step in trehalose synthesis, is essential for Arabidopsis embryo maturation", PLANT J., (2002), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1365-313x.2002.01220.x, pages 225 - 235, XP002213292

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313x.2002.01220.x
    - NUCCIO, M.L.; RUSSELL, B.L.; NOLTE, K.D.; RATHINASABAPATHI, B.; GAGE, D.A.; HANSON, D.A., "The endogenous choline supply limits glycine betaine synthesis in transgenic tobacco expressing choline monooxygenase", PLANT J., (1998), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1365-313x.1998.00316.x, pages 487 - 496, XP002180287

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313x.1998.00316.x
    - RANOCHA, P.; MCNEIL, S.D.; ZIEMAK, M.J.; LI, C.; TARCZYNSKI, M.C.; HANSON, A.D., "The S-methylmethionine cycle in angiosperms: ubiquity, antiquity and activity", PLANT J., (2001), vol. 25, pages 575 - 584
    - RONTEIN, D.; DIEUAIDE-NOUBHANI, M.; DUFOURC, E.J.; RAYMOND, P.; ROLIN, D., "The metabolic architecture of plant cells. Stability of central metabolism and flexibility of anabolic pathways during the growth cycle of tomato cells", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 42948 - 43960
    - VOGEL, G.; AESCHBACHER, R.A.; MIILLER, J.; BOLLER, T.; WIEMKEN, A., "Trehalose-6- phosphate phosphatases from Arabidopsis thaliana: identification by functional complementation of the yeast tps2 mutant", PLANT J., (1998), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1365-313X.1998.00064.x, pages 673 - 683, XP002673948

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-313X.1998.00064.x
    - WINGLER, A., "The function of trehalose biosynthesis in plants", PHYTOCHEM., (2002), vol. 60, doi:doi:10.1016/S0031-9422(02)00137-1, pages 437 - 440, XP004359472

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-9422(02)00137-1
    - ARMENTA, R.; T. TARNOWSKI; 1. GIBBONS; E.F. ULLMAN, "Improved Sensitivity in Homogeneous Enzyme Immunoassays using a Fluorogenic Macromolecular Substrate: an Assay for Serum Ferritin", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1985), vol. 146, doi:doi:10.1016/0003-2697(85)90418-X, pages 211 - 219, XP024823303

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(85)90418-X
    - EBERT P.; HA S.; AN, G., "Identification of an essential upstream element in the nopaline synthase promoter by stable and transient assays", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 5745 - 5749
    - LAWTON M.; TIERNEY M; NAKAMURA I.; ANDERSON E.; KOMEDA Y.; DUBE P.; HOFFMAN N.; FRALEY R.; BEACHY R., "Expression of a soybean 0-conclycinin gene under the control of the Cauliflower Mosaic Virus 35S and 19S promoters in transformed petunia tissues", PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 9, pages 315 - 324
    - ODELL J.; NAGY F.; CHUA N., "Identification of DNA sequences required for activity of the cauliflower mosaic virus 35S promoter", NATURE, (1985), vol. 313, doi:doi:10.1038/313810a0, pages 810 - 812, XP002915192

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/313810a0
    - SANGER M.; DAUBERT S.; GOODMAN R., "Characteristics of a strong promoter from figwort mosaic virus: comparison with the analogous 35S promoter from cauliflower mosaic virus and the regulated mannopine synthase promoter", PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 14, pages 433 - 43
    - PELLEGRINESCHI A.; KIS M.; DIX I.; KAVANAGH T.; DIX P., "Expression of horseradish peroxidase in transgenic tobacco", BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (1995), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 247 - 250
    - WALKER J.; HOWARD E.; DENNIS, E.; PEACOCK W., "DNA sequences required for anaerobic expression of the maize alcohol dehydrogenase 1 gene", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 6624 - 6628, XP002119474
    - YANG N.; RUSSELL D., "Maize sucrose synthase- promoter directs phloem cell-specific expression of Gus gene in transgenic tobacco plants", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.87.11.4144, pages 4144 - 8, XP002031955

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.87.11.4144
    - CHANDLER V.; RADICELLA J.; ROBBINS T.; CHEN J.; TURKS D., "Two regulatory genes of the maize anthocyanin pathway are homologous: isolation of B utilizing R genomic sequences", PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, pages 1175 - 1183
    - BATZER M.; CARLTON J.; DEININGER P., "Enhanced evolutionary PCR using oligonucleotides with inosine at the 3'-terminus", NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1991), vol. 19, page 5081, XP000606380
    - OHTSUKA E.; MATSUKI S.; IKEHARA M.; TAKAHASHI Y.; MATSUBARA K., "An alternative approach to deoxyoligonucleotides as hybridization probes by insertion of deoxyinosine at ambiguous codon positions", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1985), vol. 260, pages 2605 - 2608, XP002031938
    - ROSSOLINI G.; CRESTI S.; INGIANNI A.; CATTANI P.; RICCIO M.; SATTA G., "Use of deoxyinosine- containing primers vs. degenerate primers for polymerase chain reaction based on ambiguous sequence information", MOL. CELL. PROBES, (1994), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1006/mcpr.1994.1013, pages 91 - 98, XP024798443

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mcpr.1994.1013
    - INGELBRECHT I.; HERMAN L.; DEKEYSER R.; VAN MONTAGU M.; DEPICKER A., "Different 3' end regions strongly influence the level of gene expression in plant cells", PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, pages 671 - 680
    - GEISER M.; SCHWEITZER S.; GRIMM C., "The hypervariable region in the genes coding for entomopathogenic crystal proteins of Bacillus thuringiensis: nucleotide sequence of the kurhdl gene ofsubsp. kurstaki HD1", GENE, (1986), vol. 48, pages 109 - 118
    - VAN DAMME E.; SMEETS K.; VAN LEUVEN F.; PEUMANS W., "Molecular cloning of mannose-binding lectins from Clivia miniata", PLANT MOL. BIOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 825 - 830
    - CASTLE L.; SIEHL D.; GORTON R.; PATTEN P.; CHEN Y.; BERTAIN S.; CHO H.; DUCK N.; WONG J.; LIU D., "Discovery and directed evolution of a glyphosate tolerance gene", SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 304, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1096770, pages 1151 - 1154, XP002470810

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1096770
    - CHENG M.; JARRET R.; ZHIJIAN L.; XING A.; DEMSKI J., "Production of fertile transgenic peanut (Arachis hypogaea L.) plants using Agrobacterium tumefaciens", PLANT CELL REP., (1996), vol. 15, pages 653 - 657
    - CHENG M.; FRY J.; PANG S.; ZHOU H.; HIRONAKA C.; DUNCAN D.; CONNER T.; WAN Y., "Genetic Transformation of Wheat Mediated by Agrobacterium tumefaciens", PLANT CELL REP., (1997), vol. 15, pages 971 - 980, XP002918248
    - MCKENTLY A.; MOORE G.; DOOSTDAR H.; NEIDZ R., "Agrobacterium-mediated transformation of peanut (Arachis hypogaea L.) embryo axes and the development of transgenic plants", PLANT CELL REP., (1995), vol. 14, pages 699 - 703
    - NEWELL, C. A., "Plant Transformation Technology", MOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2000), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1385/MB:16:1:53, pages 53 - 65, XP009057269

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/MB:16:1:53
    - BIRREN ET AL., Genome Analysis: Detecting Genes, COLD SPRING HARBOR, (1998), vol. 1
    - BIRREN ET AL., Genome Analysis: Analyzing DNA, COLD SPRING HARBOR, (1998), vol. 2
    - JONES J.; DUNSMUIR P.; BEDBROOK J., "High level expression of introduced chimaeric genes in regenerated transformed plants", EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, pages 2411 - 2418
    - DE ALMEIDA E.; GOSSELE V.; MULLER C.; DOCKX J.; REYNAERTS A.; BOTTERMAN J.; KREBBERS E.; TIMKO M., "Transgenic expression of two marker genes under the control of an Arabidopsis rbcS promoter: Sequences encoding the Rubisco transit peptide increase expression levels", MOL. GEN. GENETICS, (1989), vol. 218, doi:doi:10.1007/BF00330568, pages 78 - 86, XP055344534

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00330568
    - KOMAMYTSKY, S.; BORIS, N., "Functional analysis of promoter elements in plants", GENETIC ENGINEERING, (2003), vol. 25, pages 113 - 141
 US20090186025