Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792883

EP2792883 - Pump for transporting water [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.10.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.11.2015  [2015/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kleeblatt, Samuel
25 Rue du Fourneau
6747 Chatillon / BE
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Hansen, Jochen
Hansen und Heeschen
Patentanwälte
Eisenbahnstrasse 5
21680 Stade / DE
[2014/43]
Application number, filing date13187092.502.10.2013
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateLU2013009218118.04.2013         Original published format: LU 92181
[2014/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792883
Date:22.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:F04D3/00, F04D13/08, F04D29/52
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Pumpe zum Fördern von Wasser[2014/43]
English:Pump for transporting water[2014/43]
French:Pompe de transport d'eau[2014/43]
Examination procedure02.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/43]
23.04.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/48]
26.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/48]
Documents cited:Search[XI]JPS60219498  (HITACHI LTD; HITACHI TECHNO ENG) [X] 1-3,6 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 4 * [I] 4,5;
 [XYI]EP0121456  (TERRIER ANDRE) [X] 1,6 * the whole document * * page 4, lines 15-33 * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-4 [I] 5;
 [XYI]JP2001115985  (EBARA CORP) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 3, 4 * [Y] 2-4 [I] 5;
 [Y]JPH0842566  (KOYO SEIKO CO) [Y] 2-4 * abstract * * the whole document * * figure 3 *;
 [A]JP2003003985  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1,5 * abstract * * figure 3 *;
 [A]EP1936204  (KAEHLIG MATTHIAS [DE]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document * * paragraph [0023] * * figure 1 *;
 [A]AU2011101137  (DEVICO AS NORWAY) [A] 4 * the whole document * * page 3, lines 1-4 * * page 4, lines 5-9 *
by applicantUSD567821S