Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2857192

EP2857192 - Glass having integrated switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  17.04.2015
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGC Glass Europe
Avenue Jean Monnet 4
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2015/15]
Inventor(s)01 / Cumpelik, Pavel
AGC Glass Europe
Na vysluni 278
417 42 Krupka / CZ
 [2015/15]
Representative(s)Larangé, Françoise , et al
AGC Glass Europe
Technovation Centre
IP Department
Rue Louis Blériot, 12
6041 Gosselies / BE
[2015/15]
Application number, filing date13187207.903.10.2013
[2015/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2857192
Date:08.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:B32B17/00, H03K17/96
[2015/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Glas mit integrierter Schaltvorrichtung[2015/15]
English:Glass having integrated switching device[2015/15]
French:Verre disposant d'un dispositif de commutation intégré[2015/15]
Examination procedure03.10.2013Examination requested  [2015/15]
13.04.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/21]
Documents cited:Search[I]US2006272227  (DOEPPNER CHRISTOPH [DE]) [I] 1-9 * figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0042] *;
 [A]WO2007085599  (GLAVERBEL [BE]; LEFEVRE HUGUES [BE]; LUYCKX ANTOINE [BE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 21 - line 27; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP1437215  (GLAVERBEL [BE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0008] , [0025]; figures 5,8 *