blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2728986

EP2728986 - Monitoring of the operation of a heat-dissipation system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 19.08.2020  [2020/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Schneider Electric Industries SAS
35, rue Joseph Monier
92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
[2014/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Lopez, Josep
Calle Marina nº17 2n
08390 Montgat (Barcelona) / ES
02 / Perrin, Alain
252 impasse de la Crozat
38500 Saint Nicolaas de Macherin / FR
 [2014/19]
Representative(s)Novaimo
Europa 1
362, avenue Marie Curie
Archamps Technopole
74166 Saint Julien-en-Genevois Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/29]Novaimo
ActiTech 8
60 avenue Marie Curie
Archamps Technopole
74166 Saint Julien en Genevois Cedex / FR
Former [2014/19]Novaimo
Bâtiment Europa 2
310 avenue Marie Curie
Archamps Technopole
74166 Saint Julien en Genevois Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date13187967.809.10.2013
[2014/19]
Priority number, dateFR2012006051806.11.2012         Original published format: FR 1260518
[2014/19]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2728986
Date:07.05.2014
Language:FR
[2014/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2728986
Date:19.07.2017
Language:FR
[2017/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2014
ClassificationIPC:H05K7/20, F04D27/00
[2014/19]
CPC:
H05K7/207 (EP); F04D27/004 (EP); H05K7/20209 (EP);
Y02B30/70 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/29]
Former [2014/19]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Betriebsüberwachung eines Wärmeableitungssystems[2014/19]
English:Monitoring of the operation of a heat-dissipation system[2014/19]
French:Surveillance du fonctionnement d'un système de dissipation thermique[2014/19]
Examination procedure15.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
15.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.2017Fee for grant paid
01.06.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.06.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.02.2017
Opposition(s)20.04.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201503   M06   Fee paid on   08.12.2015
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.10.2013
AL19.07.2017
AT19.07.2017
CY19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
MK19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
PT19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
TR19.07.2017
IE09.10.2017
LU09.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
[2020/34]
Former [2020/28]HU09.10.2013
AT19.07.2017
CY19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
MK19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
PT19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
TR19.07.2017
IE09.10.2017
LU09.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2020/15]HU09.10.2013
AT19.07.2017
CY19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
MK19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
TR19.07.2017
IE09.10.2017
LU09.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2019/51]HU09.10.2013
AT19.07.2017
CY19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
MK19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
IE09.10.2017
LU09.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2019/46]HU09.10.2013
AT19.07.2017
CY19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
IE09.10.2017
LU09.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2019/31]HU09.10.2013
AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
IE09.10.2017
LU09.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/45]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
IE09.10.2017
LU09.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
MT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
LU09.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/39]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SI19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
LU09.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/36]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
LU09.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/35]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
LU09.10.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/26]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
MC19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/24]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
EE19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
IT19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RO19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
SK19.07.2017
SM19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT19.07.2017
CZ19.07.2017
DK19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/12]AT19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
LV19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
PL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
BG19.10.2017
NO19.10.2017
GR20.10.2017
IS19.11.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.07.2017
FI19.07.2017
HR19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
RS19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/09]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
SE19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/08]FI19.07.2017
LT19.07.2017
NL19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Former [2018/07]LT19.07.2017
NO19.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]US6528987  (BLAKE JOHN [IE], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 28 * * column 7, lines 20-34 *;
 [A]US6400113  (GARCIA RAY [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 26 * * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 11 *;
 [A]US5835786  (BROWN ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 27 *;
 [A]US6009362  (FURUKAWA TOMOFUMI [JP]) [A] 1-18 * column 5, lines 18-58; claim 1 *
by applicantWO2011131421
 JP2003322380
 WO2011145186
 JPH0821648
 KR20030009960
 FR2769265
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.