Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2687287


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.07.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
06.07.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
15.03.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
03.08.2016 Change - representative
13.07.2016 Deletion: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
13.07.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.07.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
24.06.2016 Publication of search report published on  27.07.2016  [2016/30]
24.06.2016 Change - classification published on  27.07.2016  [2016/30]
24.06.2016 Change - classification published on  27.07.2016  [2016/30]
13.05.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.10.2014 Change - representative
29.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.01.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.01.2014  [2014/04]
14.10.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid