Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2687287

EP2687287 - Delivery particles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.08.2017  [2017/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2014/04]
Inventor(s)01 / DIHORA, Jiten Odhavji
4521 Randall Drive
Hamilton, OH Ohio 45011 / US
02 / SMETS, Johan
Bollenberg 79
3210 Lubbeek / BE
03 / SCHWANTES, Todd Arlin
5057 Machickanee Lane
Lena, WI Wisconsin 54139 / US
04 / SANDS, Peggy, Dorothy
W5909 Cliff Drive
Appleton, WI Wisconsin 54915 / US
 [2014/04]
Representative(s)Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir , et al
N.V. Procter & Gamble
Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/04]Morelle, Evelyne Charlotte Isabelle
N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date13188010.612.05.2010
[2014/04]
Priority number, dateUS20100328954P28.04.2010         Original published format: US 328954 P
[2014/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2687287
Date:22.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2687287
Date:27.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B01J13/18, A61K8/11, C09B67/08, C09B67/02, C11D3/50, C11D17/00, D06M23/12, A61Q13/00, A61K8/81
[2014/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/04]
TitleGerman:Freisetzungspartikel[2014/04]
English:Delivery particles[2014/04]
French:Particules d'administration[2014/04]
Examination procedure28.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/34]
16.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/34]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10720821.7  / EP2563507
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100720821) is  26.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
10.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
07.05.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
06.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201708   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2009134234  (APPLETON PAPER INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] - [0015] - [0034] , [0043] , [0065]; example -; claim - * [I] 1-15;
 [XI]US2009274905  (SCHWANTES TODD ARLIN [US]) [X] 1-6,10,15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0015] - [0018] - [0 27] - [0028] - [0 42] , [ 107] , [0116]; example -; claim -; table 1 * [I] 1-15;
 [A]WO2006127454  (APPLETON PAPER INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * example -; claim - *;
 [XI]WO2009090169  (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,10,15 * page 10; example -; claim - * [I] 1-15
by applicantUS6592990
 US4708924
 US4166152
 US4093556
 US3965033
 US3660304
 US4588639
 US4610927
 US4552811
 US4285720
 US4601863
 US3886085
 US5596051
 US5292835
 US3516941
 US6375872
 US4001140
 US4087376
 US4089802
 US4100103
 US2800458
 US2800457
 US2730456
 US6531156
 US4251386
 US4356109
 US4221710
 US4444699
 US5105823
 US4197346
 US4622267
 US4547429
 US5407609
 US4081376
 GB2062570
 US2730457
 US4105823
 US4515705
 US4537706
 US4537707
 US4550862
 US4561998
 US4597898
 US4968451
 US5565145
 US5929022
 US6294514
 US6376445
 US7069658
 US6944952
 US6594904
 US6182365
 US6185822
 US6298558
 US5113585
 USD424745S
 US2486921
 US2486922
 US2396278
 US3332880
 US3929678
 US2658072
 US2438091
 US2528378
 US4275055
 US3962418
 US2007207109
 US3958581
 USRE34584E
 US5104646
 US5106609
 US2826551
 US3964500
 US4364837
 US6607717
 US6482969
 US5807956
 US5981681
 US6207782
 US7465439
 US2007286837
 US2005048549
 US7041767
 US7217777
 US2007041929
 US5674478
 US5750122
 US4529586
 US4507280
 US4663158
 US4197865
 US4217914
 US4381919
 US4422853
 US2809971
 US3236733
 US3753196
 US3761418
 US4345080
 US4323683
 US4379753
 US4470982
 US4741855
 US6159485
 US5607980
 US5681852
 US5652228
 US5487884
 US6235773
 US2006275237
 US2004175347
 US6325995
 US6696049
 US6503495
 US7270828
 US2009221463
 US5576282
 US6306812
 US6326348
 US4430243
 US5597936
 US5595967
 US6225464
 US5879584
 US5691297
 US5574005
 US5569645
 US5565422
 US5516448
 US5489392
 US5486303
    - HERBIG, "Encapsulation", KIRK OTHMER, ENCYCLOPEDIA OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY, vol. 13, pages 436 - 456
    - HUBER, "Capsular Adhesives", TAPPI, (196605), vol. 49, no. 5, pages 41A - 44A
    - ZHANG, Z.; SUN, G, "Mechanical Properties of Melamine-Formaldehyde microcapsules", J. MICROENCAPSULATION, (2001), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 593 - 602, XP008139505