Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2775348

EP2775348 - Active matrix and display panel comprising same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 12.09.2018  [2018/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Himax Display, Inc.
No. 26, Zilian Road
Xinshi District
Tainan City 74148 / TW
[2014/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Li, Yuet-Wing
c/o No. 26, Zilian Rd.
Xinshi Dist.
74148 Tainan City / TW
02 / Fan-Chiang, Kuan-Hsu
c/o No. 26, Zilian Rd.
Xinshi Dist.
74148 Tainan City / TW
 [2014/37]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[2014/37]
Application number, filing date13188830.716.10.2013
[2014/37]
Priority number, dateUS201361774561P07.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361774561 P
US20131404534303.10.2013         Original published format: US201314045343
[2014/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2775348
Date:10.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/1362, G02F1/1335
[2014/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Aktive Matrix und Anzeigetafel damit[2014/37]
English:Active matrix and display panel comprising same[2014/37]
French:Matrice active et panneau d'affichage la comprenant[2014/37]
Examination procedure16.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/37]
19.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.08.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/37]
06.08.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.10.2018
12.10.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6133976  (KIMURA KOICHI [JP]) [X] 1,6-9,14-16 * Embodiment 8; column 22, line 14 - column 25, line 46; figures 37-44 * [I] 2-5,10-13;
 [XI]EP0837354  (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,6-9,14-16 * column 7, line 40 - column 9, line l; figure 1 * * column 5, line 17 - column 7, line 39; figures 9-14 * [I] 2-5,10-13;
 [XI]US6356327  (MOORE PAUL MCKAY [US]) [X] 1,6-8 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 60; figures 2-4; claims 15,18 * [I] 2-5,9-16