EP2862818 - Method of order fulfilling by making storage units available from a storage facility in a desired sequence at a pack station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dematic Accounting Services GmbH Carl-Legien-Strasse 15 63073 Offenbach / DE | [2015/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamashita, Shin Birkenwald Str. 69 63179 Obertshausen / DE | [2015/17] | Representative(s) | Moser Götze & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | [2015/17] | Application number, filing date | 13189234.1 | 18.10.2013 | [2015/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2862818 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/137 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
B65G1/1378 (EP,KR,MX,US);
B65G1/026 (KR);
B65G1/0414 (KR);
B65G1/065 (KR);
B65G1/10 (KR);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Auftragserfüllung durch Verfügbarmachung von Lagereinheiten aus einer Lagereinrichtung in gewünschter Reihenfolge in einer Verpackungsstation | [2015/17] | English: | Method of order fulfilling by making storage units available from a storage facility in a desired sequence at a pack station | [2015/17] | French: | Procédé de réalisation de commande en rendant disponible les unités de stockage à partir d'une installation de stockage dans une séquence souhaitée au niveau d'une station de prélèvement | [2015/17] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Examination requested [2015/17] | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/16] | 30.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/16] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011295413 (HARA YUSUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0031] * * figure 2 *; | [A]DE102011104511 (SSI SCHAEFER PEEM GMBH [AT]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0049] * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102011116081 (SSI SCHAEFER PEEM GMBH [AT]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0052] ** figure 1 * | by applicant | DE29912230U | EP2170742 |