EP2830048 - Apparatus and method for realizing a SAOC downmix of 3D audio content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.12.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.2016 [2016/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states Friedrich-Alexander-Universität Erlangen-Nürnberg Schlossplatz 4 91054 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Friedrich-Alexander-Universität Erlangen-Nürnberg Schlossplatz 4 91054 Erlangen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Disch, Sascha Schupferstr. 49 90482 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Fuchs, Harald Amselstr. 5 91341 Röttenbach / DE | 03 /
Hellmuth, Oliver Geschwister-Voemel-Weg 60 91052 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
Herre, Jürgen Rathsberger Str. 10a 91054 Erlangen / DE | 05 /
Murtaza, Adrian Str. Constantin Argetoianu Nr 8 bl 6 sc 1 ap. 2 200082 Craiova / DE | 06 /
Ridderbusch, Falko Buchenbach Anlage 13a 91056 Erlangen / DE | 07 /
Paulus, Jouni Am ErlangerWeg 46 91052 Erlangen / DE | 08 /
Terentiv, Leon Am Europakanal 36 91056 Erlangen / DE | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Zinkler, Franz Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler & Partner Postfach 246 82043 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 13189281.2 | 18.10.2013 | [2015/05] | Priority number, date | EP20130177371 | 22.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13177371 | EP20130177357 | 22.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13177357 | EP20130177378 | 22.07.2013 Original published format: EP 13177378 | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2830048 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/008, H04S3/00 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
G10L19/008 (EP,RU,US);
H04S3/02 (RU,US);
H04S3/00 (EP,RU,US);
H04S3/006 (RU,US);
H04S3/008 (EP,RU,US);
H04S7/305 (US);
H04S2400/01 (EP,US);
H04S2400/03 (EP,US);
H04S2400/11 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Realisierung eines SAOC-Downmix von 3D-Audioinhalt | [2015/05] | English: | Apparatus and method for realizing a SAOC downmix of 3D audio content | [2015/05] | French: | Appareil et procédé permettant de réaliser un mixage réducteur SAOC de contenu audio 3D | [2015/05] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 29.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/03] | 04.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010094631 (ENGDEGARD JONAS [SE], et al) [A] 7,8 * paragraph [0046]; figure 1 ** paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0079]; figures 7-8 *; | [XI]US2010174548 (BEACK SEUNG-KWON [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,11-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0042]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0076]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0125]; figures 10-13 * * paragraph [0084] * [I] 4,7,8,10; | [A]WO2013064957 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 4,10 * page 10, line 9 - page 14, line 4; figures 7-8 * * page 14, lines 23-27 * * page 15 * | by applicant | - "MPEG audio technologies - Part 2: Spatial Audio Object Coding (SAOC", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 (MPEG) INTERNATIONAL STANDARD 23003-2 | - VILLE PULKKI, "Virtual Sound Source Positioning Using Vector Base Amplitude Panning", J. AUDIO ENG. SOC., (199706), vol. 45, no. 6, pages 456 - 466 | - MATTHIAS GEIER; JENS AHRENS; SASCHA SPORS., "Object-based audio reproduction and the audio scene description format", ORG. SOUND, (201012), vol. 15, no. 3, pages 219 - 227 |