Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2816811

EP2816811 - Content receiving apparatus, display device and content receiving method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.11.2015
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 23.12.2015  [2015/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Moon-ju
Hanseong 3 Cha Phill House Apt.101-1003
Dujeong-dong, Seobuk-gu, Cheonan-si
Chungcheongnam-do / KR
 [2014/52]
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/52]Walaski, Jan Filip
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date13189383.618.10.2013
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateKR2013006889117.06.2013         Original published format: KR 20130068891
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816811
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/41, H04N21/434, H04N21/4623, H04N21/643, H04N21/438
[2014/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Inhaltsempfangsvorrichtung, Anzeigevorrichtung und Inhaltsempfangsverfahren dafür[2014/52]
English:Content receiving apparatus, display device and content receiving method thereof[2014/52]
French:Appareil de réception de contenu, dispositif d'affichage et son procédé de réception de contenu[2014/52]
Examination procedure18.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/52]
25.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/52]
04.08.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/52]
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2006062200  (WANG CHARLES C [US] ET AL WANG CHARLES CHUANMING [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,11,13,14 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,8,9,12,15;
 [XI]US2008069521  (OSAKI YOSHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,11,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0076] * [I] 3,4,8,9,12,15;
 [XI]US2008120671  (SIM JAECHEOL [KR] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,11,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0049] * [I] 3,4,8,9,12,15;
 [XI]EP2566128  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10,11,13,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0076] * [I] 3,4,8,9,12,15;
 [I]JP2004228850  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0039] *