Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2816811 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2816811



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 119
18.11.2015 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
04.08.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.11.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
23.10.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.10.2014 Document annexed to the Extended European Search Report Search / examination 13
23.10.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 5
23.10.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
16.10.2014 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
15.01.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
19.12.2013 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 47
18.10.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.10.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
18.10.2013 Annex Search / examination 1
18.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
18.10.2013 Description Search / examination 17
18.10.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.10.2013 Drawings Search / examination 11
18.10.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4