Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2759963

EP2759963 - Energy management for PET recycling systems [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krones AG
Böhmerwaldstraße 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
[2014/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Peters, Norbert
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
 [2014/31]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2018/26]
Former [2014/31]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date13189622.722.10.2013
[2014/31]
Priority number, dateDE20131020111624.01.2013         Original published format: DE102013201116
[2014/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2759963
Date:30.07.2014
Language:DE
[2014/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2759963
Date:27.06.2018
Language:DE
[2018/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q10/00, G06Q10/06
[2014/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/26]
Former [2014/31]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Energiemanagement für PET-Recycling-Anlagen[2014/31]
English:Energy management for PET recycling systems[2014/31]
French:Gestion de l'énergie pour installations de recyclage de PET[2014/31]
Examination procedure17.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
26.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
03.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.10.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2018Fee for grant paid
17.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.11.2014
Opposition(s)28.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
LU22.10.2018
IS27.10.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/28]CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/26]CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/12]CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/11]CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/09]EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/08]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2018/52]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/51]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/50]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/49]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
NO27.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2366656  (KRONES AG [DE]) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0061] *