blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2759963 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2759963



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 291
02.05.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
09.07.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
01.06.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
17.05.2018 English translation of the claims Search / examination 5
17.05.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 8
17.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
02.02.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
02.02.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.02.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.02.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 19
02.02.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 19
27.10.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
27.10.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 13
27.10.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
27.10.2017 Description Search / examination 13
27.10.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
03.07.2017 Annex to a communication Search / examination 10
03.07.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
03.07.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
03.07.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
03.07.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
03.07.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.06.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
26.06.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
19.06.2017 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.10.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
11.10.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
11.10.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
06.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
06.10.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
06.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
06.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
06.10.2016 Claims Search / examination 4
06.10.2016 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 7
14.09.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Search / examination 1
04.08.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
03.08.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.08.2016 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
02.08.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
28.06.2016 Annex Search / examination 1
28.06.2016 Oral proceedings: Request for postponement Search / examination 1
23.06.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
22.06.2016 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.06.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 8
21.06.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
21.06.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
30.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
30.03.2015 Claims Search / examination 2
30.03.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
26.11.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.11.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
05.11.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
04.11.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.10.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
17.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.10.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
17.10.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
04.08.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
02.07.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
21.03.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.03.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 4
21.03.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
05.03.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
11.11.2013 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
11.11.2013 Priority document Search / examination 20
22.10.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.10.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
22.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
22.10.2013 Description Search / examination 13
22.10.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.10.2013 Drawings Search / examination 1
22.10.2013 Priority search results Search / examination 5
22.10.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5