blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2759963


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.07.2019 [2019/28]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019 [2019/26]
03.05.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
25.05.2018 (Expected) grant published on  27.06.2018  [2018/26]
22.05.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
22.05.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.05.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
01.02.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.10.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.07.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.07.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.10.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.10.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
07.10.2016 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
01.08.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
29.07.2016 Deletion: Date of oral proceedings
29.07.2016 Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
29.07.2016 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
20.06.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
15.10.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.04.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.12.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.11.2014 First examination report
24.10.2014 Change - designated states published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
24.10.2014 Change - request for examination published on  26.11.2014  [2014/48]
22.10.2014 Amendment by applicant
29.07.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]
27.06.2014 Request for examination filed published on  30.07.2014  [2014/31]