blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2759963 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410024808 EP13189622



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2014207692Global Dossier 24.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013201116 24.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN103963188BGlobal Dossier 07.09.2016B
CN103963188 06.08.2014A
Priority number Date
DE102013201116 24.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2759963Global Dossier 27.06.2018B1
EP2759963 30.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013201116 24.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
BR102014001343 02.08.2016A2
Priority number Date
DE102013201116 24.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CA2834012 24.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013201116 24.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102013201116 24.07.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102013201116 24.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
IN3425DEL2013 19.06.2015A
Priority number Date
DE102013201116 24.01.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
MX348248 05.06.2017B
MX2014000941 23.07.2014A
Priority number Date
DE102013201116 24.01.2013