Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2689806

EP2689806 - Oral compositions containing extracts of myristica fragrans and related methods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.06.2015
Database last updated on 21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.07.2015  [2015/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10022 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/05]For all designated states
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Trivedi, Harsh M.
30 Burniston Court
Hillsborough, NJ New Jersey 08844 / US
02 / Gittins, Elizabeth K.
1042 Beerhaven Terrace
Stewartsville, NJ New Jersey 08886 / US
 [2014/05]
Representative(s)Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2014/05]
Application number, filing date13189942.901.12.2010
[2014/05]
Priority number, dateUS20090266570P04.12.2009         Original published format: US 266570 P
[2014/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2689806
Date:29.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/05]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP05.12.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61Q11/00, A61K36/185
[2014/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/05]
TitleGerman:Orale Zusammensetzungen mit Extrakten aus Myristica fragrans und zugehörige Verfahren[2014/05]
English:Oral compositions containing extracts of myristica fragrans and related methods[2014/05]
French:Compositions orales contenant des extraits de myristica fragrans et procédés associés[2014/05]
Examination procedure09.05.2014Observations by third parties
29.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/36]
06.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.02.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/31]
17.03.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/31]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10787235.0  / EP2506932
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
23.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201405   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004037790  (WATANABE SHUJI [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0036] - [0040] - [0061] - [0063] - [0078] , [0083] , [0084] , [0088]; example 2 * * claims 1-23 *;
 [X]WO2006027248  (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 1-46 * * page 7, line 6 - line 8 *;
 [A]WO2004084852  (COUNCIL SCIENT IND RES [IN], et al) [A] 1-10 * table 1; compound 17 * * page 9, line 1 - page 14, line 35 *;
 [X]JPH06157259  ;
 [X]  - 0, vol. 1994, no. 27, Database accession no. 1994-221747, XP002621077 [X] 1-10 * abstract *
 [X]  - Dantaprabha Curna, DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RG12/1079A, XP002621078 [X] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [X]  - Habb-ul-Misk-B, DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. MH1/951, XP002621079 [X] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [I]  - CHUNG ET AL, "Anticariogenic activity of macelignan isolated from Myristica fragrans (nutmeg) against Streptococcus mutans", PHYTOMEDICINE, GUSTAV FISCHER VERLAG, STUTTGART, DE, (20060313), vol. 13, no. 4, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.PHYMED.2004.04.007, ISSN 0944-7113, pages 261 - 266, XP005299728 [I] 1-10 * abstract * *Introduction* and *Rapid bacterial activity of macelignan*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.phymed.2004.04.007
 [I]  - YANTI ET AL, In vitro anti-biofilm activity of macelignan isolated from Myristica fragrans Houtt. against oral primary colonizer bacteria., PHYTOTHERAPY RESEARCH : PTR MAR 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:17926328, VOL. 22, NR. 3, PAGE(S) 308 - 312, ISSN 1099-1573, XP002621080 [I] 1-10 * abstract * * sentence *Introduction* and *Discussion*

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ptr.2312
by applicant   US6264926 B1 20010724
    US7083779 B2 20060801
    US5124156 A 19920623
    US4195101 A 19800325
    US4263326 A 19810421
    US4752476 A 19880621
    US4671959 A 19870609
    US2009087501 A1 20090402
    US2007116652 A1 20070524
    US2006134025 A1 20060622
    US2006141073 A1 20060629
    US2006141039 A1 20060629
    US5980869 A 19991109
    US2006140881 A1 20060629
    US2006134024 A1 20060622
    US2006127329 A1 20060615
    US5776435 A 19980707
    - INDU, M.N. ET AL., "Antimicrobial Activity of Some of the South- Indian Spices Against Serotypes of Escherichia Coli, Salmonella, Listeria Monocytogenes and Aeromonas Hydrophila", BRAZ. J. MICROBIOLOGY, (2006), vol. 37, pages 153 - 158,
    - PHYTOTHERAPY RES., (1999), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 344 - 45,
    - RAM, A. ET AL., J OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, (1996), vol. 55, no. 1, pages 49 - 53,
    - JANSSENS, J. ET AL., J. OF ETHNOPHARMACOL, (1990), vol. 29, no. 2, pages 179 - 88,
    - BMC COMPLEMENT ALTERN MED., (2003), vol. 3, no. 1, page 6,
    - EXPERENTIA, (1978), vol. 37, no. 4, pages 492 - 3,
    - J. ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, (1982), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 61 - 66,
    - VET HUM TOXICOL, (1984), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 17 - 20,
    - PROC. SOC. EXP. BIO. MED., (1963), vol. 112, pages 647 - 50,
    - J ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, (1994), vol. 42, no. 2, pages 117 - 24,
    - METHODS FIND EXP CLIN PHARMACOL, (2002), vol. 24, no. 10, pages 675 - 80,
    - PHARMACOL BIOCHEM BEHAV, (2002), vol. 71, no. 1-2, pages 239 - 44,
    - BURKILL, vol. 11, pages 1528 - 30,
    - B.P.C., (1959), page 502,
    - NAYAR, J., BOMBAY NAT. HIST. SOC., vol. 52, no. 515, pages 1954 - 55,
    - International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary and Handbook,
    - DEWHIRST, PROSTAGLANDINS, (1980), vol. 20, no. 2, pages 209 - 222,
other   - "RAUGHAN", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/2283, XP003028874
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, QARAABAADEEN, pages 364 - 365,
    - "KHADIRADITAILAM", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. BP/2394B, XP003033456
    - AGNIVESA, CARAKA SAMHITA, vol. II, page 446,
    - "DANTAPRABHA CURNA (MANJANA)", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. RG12/1079A, XP003027472
    - AYURVEDA, page 585,
    - "SAHAKARAVATI", DATABASE TKDL, Database accession no. VS/2291, XP003032299
    - VAIDYA PANDITA, RASAYOGA SAGARA, vol. II, pages 642 - 643,