Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808842

EP2808842 - An apparatus and method for tracking and reconstructing three-dimensional objects [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technische Universität München
Arcisstrasse 21
80333 München / DE
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Sturm, Jürgen
Lautensackstr. 20
80787 München / DE
02 / Cremers, Daniel
Braunaugenstrasse 44
80939 München / DE
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Lucke, Andreas
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2017/33]
Former [2014/49]Lucke, Andreas
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date13190218.125.10.2013
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateEP2013017011731.05.2013         Original published format: EP 13170117
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2808842
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2808842
Date:31.12.2014
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808842
Date:16.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.12.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/579
[2017/11]
Former International [2015/01]G06T7/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2014/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verfolgung und Rekonstruktion dreidimensionaler Objekte[2014/49]
English:An apparatus and method for tracking and reconstructing three-dimensional objects[2014/49]
French:Appareil et procédé permettant de suivre et de reconstruire des objets tridimensionnels[2014/49]
Examination procedure22.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
12.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2017Fee for grant paid
04.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.10.2015
Opposition(s)17.05.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
11.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
IE25.10.2017
LU25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
FR31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG16.11.2017
GB16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
DE01.05.2018
[2018/50]
Former [2018/45]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
IE25.10.2017
LU25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
FR31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
DE01.05.2018
Former [2018/43]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
LU25.10.2017
MT25.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
FR31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
DE01.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SI16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
LU25.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
FR31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
DE01.05.2018
Former [2018/36]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
LU25.10.2017
BE31.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
DE01.05.2018
Former [2018/26]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
MC16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
EE16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
IT16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RO16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
SK16.08.2017
SM16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/21]AT16.08.2017
CZ16.08.2017
DK16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/12]AT16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
LV16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/11]AT16.08.2017
ES16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
PL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
BG16.11.2017
NO16.11.2017
GR17.11.2017
IS16.12.2017
Former [2018/10]AT16.08.2017
FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
RS16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/09]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
SE16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/08]FI16.08.2017
LT16.08.2017
NL16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Former [2018/07]LT16.08.2017
NO16.11.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2478067  (SIMPLEWARE LTD [GB]) [A] 7 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * * page 1, line 1 - line 10 * * page 1, line 18 - line 34 * * page 4, line 9 - line 20 *;
 [XI]  - Daniel Ricão Canelhas, "Scene Representation, Registration and Object Detection in a Truncated Signed Distance Function Representation of 3D Space", International Master's Thesis, (20121112), pages 1 - 78, URL: http://oru.diva-portal.org/smash/record.jsf?pid=diva2:548296, (20140401), XP055111125 [X] 1,3,10,12,15 * abstract * * figure 2.11 * * pages 19-22,34 * * sections 2,2.1,3,3.2 * [I] 2,4-9,11,13,14
 [L]  - Daniel Ricao Canelhas, "Title: Scene Representation, Registration and ObjectDetection in a Truncated Signed Distance Function Representation of 3D Space", (20121112), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://oru.diva-portal.org/smash/record.jsf?pid=diva2:548296, (20140402), XP055111420 [L] 1-15 * establishes online publication date of D1: 12.11.2012 (D1 refers to publication year 2012 on pages 1 and 6); page 2 *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Least squares - Wikipedia, the free encyclopedia", Wikipedia, (20130330), pages 1 - 16, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Least_squares&oldid=547861529, (20140401), XP055111205 [A] 2,11 * page 1 - page 2 *
 [A]  - CURLESS B ET AL, "A VOLUMETRIC METHOD FOR BUILDING COMPLEX MODELS FROM RANGE IMAGES", COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS 1996 (SIGGRAPH). NEW ORLEANS, AUG. 4 - 9, 1996; [COMPUTER GRAPHICS PROCEEDINGS (SIGGRAPH)], NEW YORK, NY : ACM, US, (19960804), pages 303 - 312, XP000682746 [A] 5,14 * page 305, column R * * figure 3 *
 [A]  - RICHARD A NEWCOMBE ET AL, "KinectFusion: Real-time dense surface mapping and tracking", MIXED AND AUGMENTED REALITY (ISMAR), 2011 10TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20111026), doi:10.1109/ISMAR.2011.6092378, ISBN 978-1-4577-2183-0, pages 127 - 136, XP032028050 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISMAR.2011.6092378
by applicant   - R. KUMMERLE; G. GRISETTI; H. STRASDAT; K. KONOLIGE; W. BURGARD, "g2o: A general framework for graph optimization", ICRA, (2011),
    - K.M. WURM; A. HORNUNG; M. BENNEWITZ; C. STACHNISS; W. BURGARD, "OctoMap: A probabilistic, flexible, and compact 3D map representation for robotic systems", WORKSHOP ON BEST PRACTICE IN 3D PERCEPTION AND MODELING FOR MOBILE MANIPULATION AT ICRA, (2010),
    - P. HENRY; M. KRAININ; E. HERBST; X. REN; D. FOX, RGB-D MAPPING: USING DEPTH CAMERAS FOR DENSE 3D MODELING OF INDOOR ENVIRONMENTS, (2010),
    - F. ENDRES; J. HESS; N. ENGELHARD; J. STURM; D. CREMERS; W. BURGARD, "An evaluation of the RGB-D SLAM systems", ICRA, (201205),
    - J. STURM; N. ENGELHARD; F. ENDRES; W. BURGARD; D. CREMERS, "A benchmarkfor evaluation of RGB-D SLAM systems", IROS, (2012),
    - R.A. NEWCOMBE; S. IZADI; O. HILLIGES; D. MOLYNEAUX; D. KIM; A.J. DAVISON; P. KOHLI; J. SHOTTON; S. HODGES; A.W. FITZGIBBON, "KinectFusion: Real-time dense surface mapping and tracking", ISMAR, (2011), pages 127 - 136,
    - WILLIAM E. LORENSEN; HARVEY E. CLINE, "Marching Cubes: A High Resolution 3D Surface Construction Algorithm", COMPUTER GRAPHICS, (1987), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 163 - 169,