Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789979

EP2789979 - Navigation system and method for displaying map on navigation system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 20.02.2019  [2019/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hyundai Mnsoft, Inc.
114-38, Wonhyoro 4-ga, Yongsan-gu
Seoul 140-711 / KR
[2014/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Sang Hun
Management Support Team
Hyundai Motor Company
114-38, Wonhyoro 4-ga, Yongsan-gu
140-711 Seoul / KR
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date13190228.025.10.2013
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateKR2013003834208.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130038342
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789979
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/32
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Navigationssystem und Verfahren zur Anzeige einer Karte auf Navigationssystem[2014/42]
English:Navigation system and method for displaying map on navigation system[2014/42]
French:Système de navigation et procédé pour afficher une carte sur un système de navigation[2014/42]
Examination procedure25.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/42]
15.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.11.2018
02.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/08]
12.10.2018Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/08]
02.11.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201806   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]US2008228393  (GEELEN PIETER [NL] ET AL) [I] 1,4,5,7,10,11,13 * paragraphs [0028] , [0 29] , [0 35] - [0037] *;
 [A]US2013047106  (SASAYAMA KOTOYU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0059] *;
 [A]US2004128070  (SCHMIDT HAUKE [US] ET AL) [A] 6,12 * paragraph [0028] *
by applicantKR20020047531