Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2789979 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2789979



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 200
11.01.2019 Closing of application Search / examination 1
05.12.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
01.11.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
10.10.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.10.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
02.10.2018 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
02.10.2018 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
02.10.2018 Means of redress Search / examination 2
01.10.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
24.09.2018 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
04.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
04.09.2018 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
06.07.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.05.2018 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
08.05.2018 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
08.05.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
08.05.2018 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.05.2018 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
23.06.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
23.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
23.02.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
23.02.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.02.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
09.06.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
01.06.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 38
23.10.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
15.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.04.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
15.04.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
15.04.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
15.04.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
15.04.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
15.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.10.2014 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
17.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
19.08.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.08.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
19.08.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
28.07.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
14.01.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.01.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
02.01.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
25.10.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.10.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
25.10.2013 Claims Search / examination 3
25.10.2013 Description Search / examination 18
25.10.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
25.10.2013 Drawings Search / examination 7
25.10.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4