Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2789979


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.01.2019 Refusal of application published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
06.12.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
01.10.2018 New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused
24.09.2018 New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings
07.05.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
03.11.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.06.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
24.02.2017 First examination report
02.11.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.06.2016 Change - representative
04.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
24.04.2015 Change - designated states published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
18.04.2015 Amendment by applicant
14.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
12.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]