Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2789979 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201310527076 EP13190228



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9383211Global Dossier 05.07.2016B2
US2014300621 09.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20130038342 08.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR101459636BGlobal Dossier 07.11.2014B1
KR20140121737 16.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130038342 08.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6375110BGlobal Dossier 15.08.2018B2
JP2014202745 27.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130038342 08.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104101348BGlobal Dossier 19.12.2017B
CN104101348 15.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130038342 08.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2789979Global Dossier 15.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20130038342 08.04.2013