Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2865256

EP2865256 - A humidity conditioning box, a method and a computer program product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.04.2016
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.05.2016  [2016/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rhino Research Europe B.V.
Dinxperlosestraatweg 88
7122 JH Aalten / NL
[2015/18]
Inventor(s)01 / van Asbrouck, Johan Gaston Marie
Moo Baan Sai Samphan 66/17
Moo 4
66000 Phichit / TH
 [2015/18]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/18]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date13190268.625.10.2013
[2015/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2865256
Date:29.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:A01C1/02, F26B9/06, F26B21/02, F26B21/08, F26B25/22
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/18]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Feuchtigkeitsregelungsbox, Verfahren und Computerprogrammprodukt[2015/18]
English:A humidity conditioning box, a method and a computer program product[2015/18]
French:Boîte de conditionnement d'humidité, procédé et produit de programme informatique[2015/18]
Examination procedure25.10.2013Examination requested  [2015/18]
30.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/18]
14.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/18]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE19641404  (ZEOLITH TECH [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,8 * abstract * * column 3, line 50 - line 63 * * figure -; claim - * [Y] 6,7,10-14 [I] 2,9;
 [Y]EP2574223  (RHINO RES EUROP B V [NL]) [Y] 6,7,10-14 * abstract * * column 2, paragraph 7 * * page 3, paragraph 17 * * page 4, paragraph 30 * * page 5, paragraphs 30,37 * * page 6, paragraphs 37,38 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]WO2013048250  (RHINO RES EUROP B V [NL]) [A] 6,7,10-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 12 * * page 5, line 3 - line 13 * * page 7, line 27 - page 8, line 5 * * page 9, line 15 - line 20 * * page 12, line 1 - line 20 * * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]US3875684  (HENNEMAN JOHN W) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure -; claim - *