Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2730896

EP2730896 - Variable scale sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.08.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
115 Tabor Road
Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US
[2015/51]
Former [2014/20]For all designated states
Honeywell International Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Milley, Andrew J.
Honeywell International Inc.
Patent Services M/S AB/2B
101 Columbia Road
P. O. Box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
02 / Sorenson, Richard C.
Honeywell International Inc.
Patent Services M/S AB/2B
101 Columbia Road
P. O. Box 2245
Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US
 [2014/20]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/20]Houghton, Mark Phillip
Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street
Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB
Application number, filing date13190334.625.10.2013
[2014/20]
Priority number, dateUS20121367368509.11.2012         Original published format: US201213673685
[2014/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2730896
Date:14.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01D18/00
[2014/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Sensor mit variablem Maßstab[2014/20]
English:Variable scale sensor[2014/20]
French:Capteur à échelle variable[2014/20]
Examination procedure25.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/20]
21.03.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
21.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
22.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination09.02.2017Appeal received No.  T1196/17
02.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
15.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
07.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2008255787  (SULLIVAN PHILIP [US] ET AL) [X] 1-8,11-15 * Abstract, Desc. [0001], [0002], [0023], [0025], [0029], Figs. 1,2 * [Y] 1-15;
 [XY]EP0559306  (AUERGESELLSCHAFT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,9-15 * Abstract, col. 2 / l. 45-58, col. 3 / l. 32-45 and Figs. 1, 2 * [Y] 1-15;
 [A]JPS5733311  (HOKUSHIN ELECTRIC WORKS) [A] 1-15 * Abstract *;
 [A]US2003221491  (ALBERT DAVID M [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * Abstract, Desc. *;
 [A]US3789658  (OLSEN D) [A] 1-15 * Abstract, Desc. *