Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2868422

EP2868422 - Method for manufacturing a component and optical irradiation device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.04.2016
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.04.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.05.2016  [2016/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
[2015/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Burbaum, Bernd, Dr.
Jenaer Strasse 23
14612 Falkensee / DE
02 / Malow, Thomas, Dr.
Im Mittelbusch 9
14129 Berlin / DE
03 / Piegert, Sebastian, Dr.
Ansbacher Strasse 66
10777 Berlin / DE
 [2015/19]
Application number, filing date13190691.929.10.2013
[2015/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2868422
Date:06.05.2015
Language:DE
[2015/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:B23K26/06, B23K26/34, B29C67/00
[2015/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Bauteils sowie optische Bestrahlungsvorrichtung[2015/19]
English:Method for manufacturing a component and optical irradiation device[2015/19]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'une composant et dispositif de rayonnement optique[2015/19]
Examination procedure29.10.2013Examination requested  [2015/19]
07.11.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/19]
15.12.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/19]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201503   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102007029052  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0011]; figures 1-7; claim 1 *;
 [A]US2013142965  (BRUCK GERALD J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0023] , [0 24]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE102011089336  (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0022]; figures 1, 2 *;
 [I]WO2006040280  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [I] 6-10 * page 4, lines 22-35; figure 1 *