Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2868410

EP2868410 - Clamping device for machine tools [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.10.2018
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 10.07.2019  [2019/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MTH GbR Markus und Thomas Hiestand
Äußerer Mühlweg 2
88630 Pfullendorf / DE
[2017/50]
Former [2015/19]For all designated states
MTH GbR Markus und Thomas Hiestand
Äußerer Mühlweg 2
88630 Pfullendorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hiestand, Karl
Äußerer Mühlweg 2
88630 Pfullendorf / DE
 [2015/19]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60
88113 Lindau / DE
[2017/50]
Former [2015/19]Engelhardt & Engelhardt
Montafonstraße 35
88045 Friedrichshafen / DE
Application number, filing date13190861.830.10.2013
[2015/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2868410
Date:06.05.2015
Language:DE
[2015/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2868410
Date:13.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:B23B31/28
[2015/19]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/19]
TitleGerman:Spanneinrichtung für Werkzeugmaschinen[2015/19]
English:Clamping device for machine tools[2015/19]
French:Dispositif de serrage pour machines-outils[2015/19]
Examination procedure19.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.06.2014Examination requested  [2015/19]
25.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.09.2017Fee for grant paid
15.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.07.2017
Opposition(s)14.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
IT13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MC13.12.2017
MT13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SI13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
[2019/28]
Former [2019/13]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
IT13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MT13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SI13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/51]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
DK13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
IT13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MT13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/43]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
IT13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
MT13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/40]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
IT13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RO13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/39]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
IT13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/38]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
IS13.04.2018
Former [2018/37]CY13.12.2017
CZ13.12.2017
EE13.12.2017
ES13.12.2017
FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
PL13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
SK13.12.2017
SM13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/34]FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
NL13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/24]FI13.12.2017
HR13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
LV13.12.2017
RS13.12.2017
SE13.12.2017
BG13.03.2018
NO13.03.2018
GR14.03.2018
Former [2018/22]FI13.12.2017
LT13.12.2017
NO13.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008073862  (ICHIMURA KAZUO [JP]) [A] 1,6,7,14,19-22 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033]; figure - *;
 [A]DE3709246  (GEDIB INGENIEURBUERO U INNOVAT [DE]) [A] 1,4-12,14,15,19-22 * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 36 * * column 5, line 68 - column 7, line 39; figure - *;
 [A]EP2548681  (HIESTAND KARL [DE]) [A] 1-7,10,11,22 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042]; figure - *;
 [AD]EP2103368  (HIESTAND KARL [DE]) [AD] 1,22 * figure -; claim 1 *
by applicantEP2103368