Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808871

EP2808871 - Reproduction apparatus, reproduction method, and reproduction program [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.06.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2015Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 15.07.2015  [2015/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba
1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku
Tokyo 105-8001 / JP
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / Morioka, Yasuhiro
c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Property
Division
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP
02 / Fujiwara, Yoshinobu
c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Property
Division
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minaot-ku
Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP
03 / Nakajima, Atsushi
c/o Toshiba Corporation, Intellectual Property
Division
1-1, Shibaura 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Henkel & Partner mbB
Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Henkel, Breuer & Partner
Patentanwälte
Maximiliansplatz 21
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date13190968.130.10.2013
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateJP2013011531031.05.2013         Original published format: JP 2013115310
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2808871
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:G11B27/34, G11B27/36
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Wiedergabevorrichtung, Wiedergabeverfahren und Wiedergabeprogramm[2014/49]
English:Reproduction apparatus, reproduction method, and reproduction program[2014/49]
French:Appareil de reproduction, procédé de reproduction et programme de reproduction[2014/49]
Examination procedure30.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/49]
17.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2015Application withdrawn by applicant  [2015/29]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2077435  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0130] , [0131]; figures 1, 11,12 *;
 [A]WO2011109439  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0027] - [0037] *;
 [A]EP1923889  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 51] - [0057]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US7313808  (GUPTA ANOOP [US] ET AL) [A] 1-12 * column 8, line 17 - column 10, line l; figure 4 *