Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2730355

EP2730355 - Molybdenum metal powder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 07.11.2018  [2018/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
H.C. STARCK, Inc.
45 Industrial Place Newton
Massachusetts 02461-1951 / US
[2014/20]
Inventor(s)01 / GRIES, Benno
An der Tongrube 10 A
38302 Wolfenbüttel / DE
 [2014/20]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/20]Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date13191201.614.10.2009
[2014/20]
Priority number, dateDE2008105178417.10.2008         Original published format: DE102008051784
US20080109347P29.10.2008         Original published format: US 109347 P
[2014/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2730355
Date:14.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2730355
Date:24.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:B22F9/16, B22F9/20, B22F9/22, C22B5/12, C22B34/34
[2014/20]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/20]
TitleGerman:Molybdänmetallpulver[2014/20]
English:Molybdenum metal powder[2014/20]
French:Poudre de molybdène métal[2014/20]
Examination procedure31.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/20]
05.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2016Fee for grant paid
04.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09804307.8  / EP2344291
Opposition(s)26.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
30.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
29.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.10.2009
BE24.08.2016
CY24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IS24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
MK24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
TR24.08.2016
AT14.10.2016
IE14.10.2016
LU14.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
GB24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
[2018/45]
Former [2018/32]HU14.10.2009
BE24.08.2016
CY24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IS24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
MK24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
AT14.10.2016
IE14.10.2016
LU14.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
MT31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
GB24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2018/28]HU14.10.2009
BE24.08.2016
CY24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
MK24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
AT14.10.2016
IE14.10.2016
LU14.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
GB24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2018/10]BE24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
AT14.10.2016
IE14.10.2016
LU14.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
GB24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/51]BE24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
IE14.10.2016
LU14.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
GB24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/42]BE24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
LU14.10.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/37]BE24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/35]BE24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
CH31.10.2016
LI31.10.2016
FR02.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/34]BE24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
FR02.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/23]BE24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/13]ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
BE31.10.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/11]ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
BE31.10.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
BE31.10.2016
NO24.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT24.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]US2006086205  (JOHNSON LOYAL M JR [US], et al) [A] 10-14 * examples 1-14; claims 1-29 *;
 [A]EP1308526  (CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS CO [US]) [A] 10-14 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0072]; figures 1-3; example 1; claims 1-27 *;
 [A]  - WERNER V. SCHULMEYERA AND HUGO M. ORTNER, "Mechanisms of the hydrogen reduction of molybdenum oxides", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF REFRACTORY METALS AND HARD MATERIALS, (2002), vol. 20, pages 261 - 269, XP002574117 [A] 10-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0263-4368(02)00029-X
by applicantUS2006086205
 US2001049981
 US2006204395
    - A. N. ZELIKMAN ET AL., "Metallurgiya redkych metallow", METALLURGIYA, (1978), page 146
    - POWDER METALLURGY AND METAL CERAMICS, (1999), vol. 38, no. 9-10, page 429
    - RADSCHENKO ET AL., POWDER METALLURGY AND METAL CERAMICS, (1999), vol. 38, no. 9-10, page 429