Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2808753

EP2808753 - Electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2018/36]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tani, Atsushi
c/o Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
02 / Hanatsuka, Akira
c/o Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
03 / Harada, Shingo
c/o Sony Corporation
1-7-1 Konan
Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2018/36]
Former [2014/49]Turner, James Arthur
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Application number, filing date13191309.701.11.2013
[2014/49]
Priority number, dateJP2013011233628.05.2013         Original published format: JP 2013112336
[2014/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2808753
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/49]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2808753
Date:18.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2808753
Date:05.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:Elektronische Vorrichtung[2014/49]
English:Electronic device[2014/49]
French:Dispositif électronique[2014/49]
Examination procedure01.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/49]
10.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
28.07.2018Fee for grant paid
28.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.03.2018
Opposition(s)06.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
MC05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
LU01.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
[2019/40]
Former [2019/37]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
MC05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
LU01.11.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
MC05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
LU01.11.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/33]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
MC05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL05.09.2018
FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
NO05.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT05.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1513047  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0025]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0026]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0048]; figures 9-12 *;
 [Y]EP2472347  (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0053]; figure 13 *;
 [Y]US2009159767  (KO WEN-SUNG [TW]) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2009230244