Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2783734

EP2783734 - Program, information processing apparatus, information processing method, and information processing system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.05.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NINTENDO CO., LTD.
11-1, Hokotate-cho
Kamitoba
Minami-ku
Kyoto 601 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Motokura, Kenta
c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd.
11-1 Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba
Minami-ku
Kyoto, 601-8501 / JP
02 / Hayashida, Koichi
c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd.
11-1 Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba
Minami-ku
Kyoto, 601-8501 / JP
03 / Kitazono, Yusuke
c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd.
11-1 Hokotate-cho, Kamitoba
Minami-ku
Kyoto, 601-8501 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date13191349.304.11.2013
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013007320129.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013073201
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2783734
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:A63F13/00, A63F13/40, A63F13/30
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Programm, Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Informationsverarbeitungsverfahren und Informationsverarbeitungssystem[2014/40]
English:Program, information processing apparatus, information processing method, and information processing system[2014/40]
French:Programme, appareil de traitement d'informations, procédé de traitement d'informations et système de traitement d'informations[2014/40]
Examination procedure02.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/11]
07.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[I]US2011111851  (HAYASHIDA KOICHI [JP] ET AL) [I] 1-17 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0007] * * abstract *;
 [A]US2005049022  (MULLEN JEFFREY D [US]) [A] 8-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072] *
by applicantJP2000237451