Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2821179

EP2821179 - Angle grinder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.10.2016  [2016/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Metabowerke GmbH
Metabo-Allee 1
72622 Nürtingen / DE
[2015/02]
Inventor(s)01 / Pietzsch, Martin
Linsenhofer Weg 16
72636 Frickenhausen / DE
 [2015/02]
Representative(s)Markfort, Iris-Anne Lucie
Lorenz & Kollegen
Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Alte Ulmer Strasse 2
89522 Heidenheim / DE
[2015/02]
Application number, filing date13191765.006.11.2013
[2015/02]
Priority number, dateDE20131021312404.07.2013         Original published format: DE102013213124
[2015/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2821179
Date:07.01.2015
Language:DE
[2015/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:B24B23/02, B24B27/08, B24B47/12
[2015/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/29]
Former [2015/02]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Winkelschleifgerät[2015/02]
English:Angle grinder[2015/02]
French:Meuleuse d'angle[2015/02]
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
03.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/29]
27.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/41]
03.06.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/41]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XDY]DE102009053614  (METABOWERKE GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1-5,8,9 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7;
 [YD]DE102008059247  (METABOWERKE GMBH [DE]) [YD] 6,7 * figure 1 *
by applicantDE4342986
 DE10059975
 DE10065658
 US6386961
 EP0579949
 DE102008059247
 DE102009053614