Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2731069

EP2731069 - Computer implemented method for generating enhanced database queries [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.03.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2014/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Yofay Kari
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
02 / Cohen, Michael Benjamin
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
03 / Boucher, Maxime
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
04 / Azzolini, Alisson Gusatti
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
05 / Li, Xiao
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
06 / Rasmussen, Lars Eilstrup
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
07 / Hymes, Kathryn
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
08 / Campbell, Amy
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
 [2014/20]
Representative(s)Schröer, Gernot H.
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/20]Schröer, Gernot H.
Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR
Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date13192539.812.11.2013
[2014/20]
Priority number, dateUS20121367469512.11.2012         Original published format: US201213674695
[2014/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2731069
Date:14.05.2014
Language:EN
[2014/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/00
[2014/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Computerimplementiertes Verfahren zur Erzeugung verbesserter Datenbankabfragen[2014/20]
English:Computer implemented method for generating enhanced database queries[2014/20]
French:Procédé mis en 'uvre par ordinateur permettant de générer des interrogations de base de données[2014/20]
Examination procedure13.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/31]
05.11.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
06.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination25.01.2017Appeal received No.  T1317/17
18.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201806   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[I]US7933843  (VON GROLL GOETZ [CH], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [I]US8185558  (NARAYANAN SRINIVAS [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0019] - paragraphs [0017] - [0025]; figures 2a, 4a, 6 *;
 [I]US2011087968  (LAKSHMANAN GEETIKA T [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract *