blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2735991 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2735991



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 135
22.06.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
20.08.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
23.07.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.06.2015 English translation of the claims Search / examination 3
18.06.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
18.06.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
25.03.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
25.03.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.03.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.03.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
03.03.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.11.2014 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
21.11.2014 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
03.06.2014 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
20.05.2014 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
20.05.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
30.04.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
21.03.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.03.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 1
21.03.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
10.03.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
02.01.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 3
15.11.2013 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
15.11.2013 Priority document Search / examination 29
13.11.2013 Abstract Search / examination 2
13.11.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
13.11.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
13.11.2013 Description Search / examination 18
13.11.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
13.11.2013 Drawings Search / examination 4
13.11.2013 Priority search results Search / examination 5
13.11.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5