blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2735991
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9047461Global Dossier 02.06.2015B2
US2014150086 29.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102012111383 23.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2735991Global Dossier 19.08.2015B1
EP2735991 28.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102012111383 23.11.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102012111383 28.05.2014A1
Priority number Date
DE102012111383 23.11.2012