Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2735991

EP2735991 - Computer implemented method for replacing a data string [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
comForte 21 GmbH
Steubenstraße 5
65189 Wiesbaden / DE
[2014/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Horst, Michael
Dorfstrasse 12 A
16816 Wuthenow / DE
 [2014/22]
Representative(s)WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98
65185 Wiesbaden / DE
[2014/22]
Application number, filing date13192726.113.11.2013
[2014/22]
Priority number, dateDE20121011138323.11.2012         Original published format: DE102012111383
[2014/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2735991
Date:28.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2735991
Date:19.08.2015
Language:DE
[2015/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/45, G06F21/62, G06F21/34, H04L29/06, G06F21/60, G06Q20/38
[2015/15]
Former International [2014/22]G06F21/34, H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/22]
TitleGerman:Computerimplementiertes Verfahren zum Ersetzen eines Datenstrings[2014/22]
English:Computer implemented method for replacing a data string[2014/22]
French:Procédé implémenté par ordinateur pour le remplacement d'une chaîne de données[2014/22]
Examination procedure20.05.2014Examination requested  [2014/27]
25.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.06.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
10.07.2015Fee for grant paid
10.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.03.2015
Opposition(s)20.05.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.11.2013
AL19.08.2015
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MK19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
TR19.08.2015
IE13.11.2015
LU13.11.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
[2018/47]
Former [2018/45]HU13.11.2013
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MK19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
TR19.08.2015
IE13.11.2015
LU13.11.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2018/29]HU13.11.2013
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MK19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
SM19.08.2015
IE13.11.2015
LU13.11.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2017/39]HU13.11.2013
BG19.08.2015
CY19.08.2015
CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
HR19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
MT19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
IE13.11.2015
LU13.11.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/45]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
IE13.11.2015
LU13.11.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/36]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SI19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
LU13.11.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/31]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
LU13.11.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/28]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
MC19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/23]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RO19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
SK19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/22]CZ19.08.2015
DK19.08.2015
EE19.08.2015
ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/21]DK19.08.2015
ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
IT19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/20]DK19.08.2015
ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES19.08.2015
FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
PL19.08.2015
RS19.08.2015
SE19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
IS19.12.2015
PT21.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI19.08.2015
LT19.08.2015
LV19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
GR20.11.2015
Former [2016/08]LT19.08.2015
NO19.11.2015
Former [2016/07]LT19.08.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US2011154466  (HARPER GLENN E [US], et al) [A] 1-5,11-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0129] *;
 [A]US2005137969  (SHAH DHARMESH [US]) [A] 1-4,7,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0016] *;
 [A]EP2363839  (PROTEGRITY CORP [KY]) [A] 1,5-15 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] *;
 [A]US2011261958  (GEBOTYS CATHERINE HELEN [CA]) [A] 1,7-10,13-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059] *
 [A]  Michael Stephenson ET AL, "Tokenization -A New Approach to Fully Comply with PCI 3.4 and Improve Data Security", The Connection, (20111001), page 20,21,36,37, URL: http://www.comforte.com/ecomaXL/get_blob.php?name=Tokenization_-_A_New_Approach_to_Fully_Comply_with, (20140314), XP055107853 [A] 1-5,11-15 * the whole document *