Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2750069

EP2750069 - Method and system for detecting malware using isolated environment [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 15.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
Moscow 125212 / RU
[2014/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Yablokov, Victor V.
c/o Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
125212 Moscow / RU
02 / Eliseev, Evgeny Y.
c/o Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
125212 Moscow / RU
 [2014/27]
Representative(s)Sloboshanin, Sergej , et al
V. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Hano Mariahilfplatz 3
81541 München / DE
[2014/27]
Application number, filing date13192835.014.11.2013
[2014/27]
Priority number, dateRU2012015643325.12.2012         Original published format: RU 2012156433
US20131403947627.09.2013         Original published format: US201314039476
[2014/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2750069
Date:02.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2750069
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/56, // G06F21/53
[2014/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
Former [2014/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und System zur Erkennung von Malware mittels isolierter Umgebung[2014/27]
English:Method and system for detecting malware using isolated environment[2014/27]
French:Procédé et système de détection de maliciels utilisant un environnement isolé[2014/27]
Examination procedure14.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/27]
10.07.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.02.2017
14.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
17.05.2017Fee for grant paid
17.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
17.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE14.11.2017
LU14.11.2017
MT14.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
[2018/50]
Former [2018/45]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE14.11.2017
LU14.11.2017
MT14.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/43]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
LU14.11.2017
MT14.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/39]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
LU14.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/33]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
Former [2018/21]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2002065776  (CALDER BRAD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-10,12-14 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0135] * * figures 1/51-51/51 * [I] 4,6,11;
 [IA]US6823460  (HOLLANDER YONA [IL], et al) [I] 1-13 * column 1, line 1 - column 3, line 25 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 39 * * column 8, line 40 - column 12, line 5 * * figures 1/13-13/13 * [A] 14;
 [IA]US6658571  (O'BRIEN RICHARD [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * column 2, line 12 - column 5, line 46 * * figures 1/6-6/6 * [A] 14;
 [IA]US6775780  (MUTTIK IGOR [GB]) [I] 1-13 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 54 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 24 * * figures 1/3-3/3 * [A] 14;
 [IA]  - THOMAS BLAÌ SING ET AL, "An Android Application Sandbox system for suspicious software detection", MALICIOUS AND UNWANTED SOFTWARE (MALWARE), 2010 5TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20101019), ISBN 978-1-4244-9353-1, pages 55 - 62, XP031833825 [I] 1-13 * page 55, column left, line 30 - page 56, column left, line 20 * * page 57, column left, line 2 - page 57, column right, line 30 * * page 59, column right, line 15 - page 60, column right, line 2 * [A] 14
 [IA]  - FRASER T ET AL, "HARDENING COTS SOFTWARE WITH GENERIC SOFTWARE WRAPPERS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1999 IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON SECURITY AND PRIVACY. OAKLAND, CA, MAY 9 - 12, 1999; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON SECURITY AND PRIVACY], LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (19990509), ISBN 978-0-7695-0177-2, pages 2 - 16, XP000871969 [I] 1-13 * page 2, column left, line 25 - page 3, column right, line 30 * * page 11, column left, line 25 - page 13, column right, line 12 * [A] 14
Examination   - Benjamin Davis ET AL, "I-ARM-Droid: A Rewriting Framework for In-App Reference Monitors for Android Applications", (20120423), URL: http://web.cs.ucdavis.edu/~hchen/paper/most2012iarmdroid.pdf, (20160122), XP055244132
    - Nikhilesh Reddy ET AL, "Application-centric security policies on unmodified Android", (20110705), URL: http://fmdb.cs.ucla.edu/Treports/110017.pdf, (20110705), XP055246641