Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2873535

EP2873535 - Workpieces with structured decorative surface [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.01.2020New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flooring Technologies Ltd.
SmartCity Malta SCM01
Office 406
Ricasoli
Kalkara SCM1001 / MT
[2017/25]
Former [2015/21]For all designated states
Flooring Technologies Ltd.
Portico Building
Marina Street
Pieta PT9044 / MT
Inventor(s)01 / Kalwa, Norbert, Dr.
Birkenweg 18a
32805 Horn-Bad Meinberg / DE
 [2015/21]
Representative(s)Obst, Bernhard
Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB
Postdamer Platz 10
10785 Berlin / DE
[2015/21]
Application number, filing date13193200.615.11.2013
[2015/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2873535
Date:20.05.2015
Language:DE
[2015/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:B44C3/02, B41M5/00, B44C5/04, B44F9/02
[2015/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/01]
Former [2015/21]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Werkstücke mit oberflächenstrukturierter Dekoroberfläche[2015/21]
English:Workpieces with structured decorative surface[2015/21]
French:Pièces dotées d'une surface de décor structuré[2015/21]
Examination procedure18.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.11.2015Examination requested  [2015/53]
18.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.01.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.07.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2108524  (UNILIN IND BVBA [BE]) [X] 1-3,5-15 * the whole document * [I] 4;
 [XA]DE102008051211  (SCHULTE GUIDO [DE]) [X] 11-14 * the whole document * [A] 1-10,15;
 [A]DE102012103491  (FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO OG [AT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102010036454  (FRITZ EGGER GMBH & CO OG [AT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102009044802
 EP2218420
 EP1645339