Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789534

EP2789534 - MULTI-BOX WING SPAR AND SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/42]Multi-box wing spar and skin
[2016/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.07.2018
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.03.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2017/36]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Moselage-III, John H
P.O Box 3707
MC 41-49
Seattle, WA Washington 98124-2207 / US
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
5th Floor, Salisbury Square House
8, Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/42]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date13193443.219.11.2013
[2014/42]
Priority number, dateUS20121368504926.11.2012         Original published format: US201213685049
[2014/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789534
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789534
Date:06.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:B64C3/18
[2014/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
TitleGerman:MULTI-BOX-FLÜGELHOLM UND -HAUT[2017/17]
English:MULTI-BOX WING SPAR AND SKIN[2016/41]
French:LONGERON D'AILE À PLUSIEURS CARTERS ET REVÊTEMENT[2017/17]
Former [2014/42]Multi-Box-Flügelholm und -haut
Former [2014/42]Multi-box wing spar and skin
Former [2014/42]Longeron d'aile à plusieurs carters et revêtement
Examination procedure19.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/42]
14.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
31.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.07.2017Fee for grant paid
31.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.07.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.09.2016
Opposition(s)07.06.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.11.2013
AT06.09.2017
CY06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
IE19.11.2017
LU19.11.2017
MT19.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU19.11.2013
AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
IE19.11.2017
LU19.11.2017
MT19.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
IE19.11.2017
LU19.11.2017
MT19.11.2017
BE30.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/45]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
IE19.11.2017
LU19.11.2017
MT19.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/43]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
LU19.11.2017
MT19.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SI06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
LU19.11.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/33]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
DK06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
MC06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
CH30.11.2017
LI30.11.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/24]AT06.09.2017
CZ06.09.2017
EE06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
PL06.09.2017
RO06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
SK06.09.2017
SM06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
IS06.01.2018
Former [2018/21]CZ06.09.2017
FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/15]FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
NL06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/12]FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
LV06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/11]FI06.09.2017
HR06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
RS06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
BG06.12.2017
NO06.12.2017
GR07.12.2017
Former [2018/09]FI06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
SE06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Former [2018/08]FI06.09.2017
LT06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Former [2018/07]LT06.09.2017
NO06.12.2017
Documents cited:Search[XDYI]EP1070661  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [XD] 1-5,9,10,14,15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-8 * [Y] 8,12 [I] 6,7,11,13;
 [Y]US5348602  (MAKARENKO PETER [US], et al) [Y] 8 * column 4, lines 6-24; figure 2 *;
 [Y]DE102007019692  (AIRBUS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006]; figures 1-3 *