Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2735688

EP2735688 - Window, door or facade element with a sealing profile with integrated light [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHÜCO International KG
Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15
33609 Bielefeld / DE
[2014/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Gehle, Jörn
Berliner Str. 6
33813 Oerlinghausen / DE
02 / Fröchte, Bernd
Otto-Wels-Str. 57
45663 Recklinghausen / DE
 [2014/22]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2014/22]
Application number, filing date13193599.120.11.2013
[2014/22]
Priority number, dateDE20121011143226.11.2012         Original published format: DE102012111432
[2014/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2735688
Date:28.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2735688
Date:24.08.2016
Language:DE
[2016/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/62
[2014/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/34]
Former [2014/22]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fenster, Tür oder Fassadenelement mit einem Dichtungsprofil mit integriertem Leuchtmittel[2014/22]
English:Window, door or facade element with a sealing profile with integrated light[2014/22]
French:Fenêtre, porte ou élément de façade doté d'un profil d'étanchéité avec moyen d'éclairage intégré[2014/22]
Examination procedure14.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/34]
26.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.07.2016Fee for grant paid
04.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.07.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.04.2016
Opposition(s)26.05.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.11.2013
AL24.08.2016
CY24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IS24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
MK24.08.2016
MT24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
TR24.08.2016
IE20.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU20.11.2013
CY24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IS24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
MK24.08.2016
MT24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
TR24.08.2016
IE20.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2018/43]HU20.11.2013
CY24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IS24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
MK24.08.2016
MT24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
IE20.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2018/32]HU20.11.2013
CY24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IS24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
MK24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
IE20.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2018/28]HU20.11.2013
CY24.08.2016
CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
MC24.08.2016
MK24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
IE20.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/51]CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
IE20.11.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/43]CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/37]CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SI24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/35]CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/32]CZ24.08.2016
DK24.08.2016
EE24.08.2016
ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
PL24.08.2016
RO24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
SK24.08.2016
SM24.08.2016
BG24.11.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/13]ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
LV24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/11]ES24.08.2016
FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
GR25.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
PT26.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI24.08.2016
HR24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
RS24.08.2016
SE24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
BE30.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI24.08.2016
IT24.08.2016
LT24.08.2016
NL24.08.2016
NO24.11.2016
Former [2017/07]LT24.08.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2010106601  (SANWA SHUTTER CORP) [X] 22 * figure 4 *
 [XI]DE202012004705U  (KLAUDIUSZ RAJSKI [DE]) [X] 1-6,22 * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067]; figures 10,18-21 * [I] 7-12,16-21
 [X]WO2009021993  (LAFUCO AS [DK], et al) [X] 22 * page 8, line 13 - line 17; figure - *
 [X]DE102006012433  (THYSSEN POLYMER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,22 * paragraph [0012]; figures 1,2 *
 [X]US2003230045  (KRAUSE RICHARD J [US] KRAUSE SR RICHARD J [US] ET AL) [X] 1,22 * abstract *
 [X]DE202004016897U  (SWS GLASBAUBESCHLAEGE GMBH [DE]) [X] 22 * figure 1; claim 1 *
 [X]DE202009007004U  (MEYER, WERNER; RÖDEL, JAN) [X] 1,22 * figure - *
 DE202012004705U  [ ]
 EP0755040  [ ]
 DE10322561  [ ]