Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2735688 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2735688



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 168
28.06.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.08.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
28.07.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.07.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 4
04.07.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.07.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
04.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
19.04.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
19.04.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
19.04.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
19.04.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 24
05.02.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.11.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
26.11.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
26.11.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
03.06.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
30.04.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.02.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.02.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
03.02.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
27.01.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
05.12.2013 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
05.12.2013 Priority document Search / examination 28
20.11.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.11.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
20.11.2013 Claims Search / examination 5
20.11.2013 Description Search / examination 16
20.11.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.11.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
20.11.2013 Drawings Search / examination 4
20.11.2013 Priority search results Search / examination 5
20.11.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5