Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2735688


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
05.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.11.2018  [2018/45]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
28.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.08.2017  [2017/35]
21.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.08.2017  [2017/34]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
30.06.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
21.04.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.05.2017  [2017/21]
24.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.03.2017  [2017/13]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
22.07.2016 (Expected) grant published on  24.08.2016  [2016/34]
08.07.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.07.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.07.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
18.04.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.11.2014 Amendment by applicant
18.07.2014 Change - designated states published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
18.07.2014 Change - request for examination published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
27.05.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]
25.04.2014 Request for examination filed published on  28.05.2014  [2014/22]