Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784715

EP2784715 - System and method for adaptive modification of antivirus databases [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.12.2017
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
Moscow 125212 / RU
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Yablokov, Victor V.
c/o Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
125212 Moscow / RU
02 / Nevstruev, Oleg V.
c/o Kaspersky Lab, ZAO
39A/3 Leningradskoe Shosse
125212 Moscow / RU
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Sloboshanin, Sergej , et al
V. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck, Hano Mariahilfplatz 3
81541 München / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date13193601.520.11.2013
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateUS20131385409631.03.2013         Original published format: US201313854096
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784715
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784715
Date:01.02.2017
Language:EN
[2017/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/56
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/41]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur adaptiven Veränderung von Antivirendatenbanken[2014/40]
English:System and method for adaptive modification of antivirus databases[2014/40]
French:Système et procédé de modification adaptative de bases de données antivirus[2014/40]
Examination procedure20.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/40]
26.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.12.2016Fee for grant paid
21.12.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.12.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.07.2015
Opposition(s)03.11.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.11.2013
AT01.02.2017
CY01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU20.11.2013
AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/33]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
MC01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2018/14]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SI01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/51]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
SM01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/50]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
DK01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/49]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
EE01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
IT01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RO01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
SK01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/48]AT01.02.2017
CZ01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Former [2017/41]AT01.02.2017
ES01.02.2017
FI01.02.2017
HR01.02.2017
LT01.02.2017
LV01.02.2017
NL01.02.2017
PL01.02.2017
RS01.02.2017
SE01.02.2017
BG01.05.2017
NO01.05.2017
GR02.05.2017
IS01.06.2017
PT01.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[A]EP2560120  (VERISIGN INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2009177514  (HUDIS EFIM [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012173493  (SABBOUH MARWAN [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
 [I]  - CODD E F, "A relational model of data for large shared data banks", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ACM, ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, INC, UNITED STATES, (19700601), vol. 13, no. 6, doi:10.1145/362384.362685, ISSN 0001-0782, pages 377 - 387, XP002219025 [I] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/362384.362685
ExaminationWO2011112348