Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799778

EP2799778 - Cooking apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.07.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.03.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dongbu Daewoo Electronics Corporation
14th Fl. Narakeyum Jeodong Building
Jeodong 1 ga Junggu
Seoul 100-031 / KR
[2014/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Han Ju
202, 705-14 Songnae-dong
Sosa-gu, Bucheon-si
422-040 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[2014/45]
Application number, filing date13194057.922.11.2013
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateKR2013004794630.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130047946
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2799778
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2799778
Date:06.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2799778
Date:29.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.12.2015
ClassificationInternational:F24C15/16, F24C15/32
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/33]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kochvorrichtung[2014/45]
English:Cooking apparatus[2014/45]
French:Appareil de cuisson[2014/45]
Examination procedure06.07.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/33]
25.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2018Fee for grant paid
23.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.07.2017
Opposition(s)31.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201705   M06   Fee paid on   28.12.2017
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
LU22.11.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
CH30.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
LI30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/37]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SI29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
LU22.11.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/34]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
LU22.11.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/33]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
MC29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
DK29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
SM29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL29.08.2018
AT29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
EE29.08.2018
ES29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
SK29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL29.08.2018
CZ29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
PL29.08.2018
RO29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
IT29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL29.08.2018
FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
LV29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI29.08.2018
HR29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
RS29.08.2018
SE29.08.2018
BG29.11.2018
NO29.11.2018
GR30.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NL29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI29.08.2018
LT29.08.2018
NO29.11.2018
IS29.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT29.08.2018
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2009188915  (NODA TOMIMITSU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,9,10,13-15 * paragraph [0108]; figures 20A,20B * * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0112]; figures 21,22 * [Y] 3,5-8,11,12;
 [Y]KR20090064501  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 3 * figure 3 *;
 [Y]JP2008190824  (SHARP KK) [Y] 5-8 * abstract *;
 [Y]KR20110058135  (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [Y] 11 * abstract *;
 [Y]US6198076  (MOEN VERNON D [US], et al) [Y] 12 * figure 7 *;
 [X]KR20100081245  (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [X] 1,2,10,13,14 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036]; figure - *;
 [X]JP2010266106  (SHARP KK) [X] 1,2,10,13,14 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]KR20110082805  (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantKR19980044155U