Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2777417

EP2777417 - Skate boot having a toe cap with rear extensions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bauer Hockey Corp.
60, rue Jean-Paul Cayer
Blainville, QC J7C 0N9 / CA
[2016/13]
Former [2015/20]For all designated states
Bauer Hockey Corp.
60 Jean-Paul Cayer Street
Blainville QC J7C 0N9 / CA
Former [2014/38]For all designated states
Bauer Hockey Corp.
905, Chemin de la Rivière du Nord
St-Jérôme, QC J7Y 5G2 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Labonté, Ivan
6717, av. Christophe-Colomb, apt. 403
Montréal, Québec H2S 2H3 / CA
 [2014/38]
Representative(s)Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/18]Cabinet Plasseraud
66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2014/38]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date13194324.325.11.2013
[2014/38]
Priority number, dateUS201361792721P15.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361792721 P
[2014/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2777417
Date:17.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2777417
Date:04.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:A43B5/16, A43B23/08
[2014/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/18]
Former [2014/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Schlittschuh mit Zehenkappe mit hinterem Erweiterungen[2014/38]
English:Skate boot having a toe cap with rear extensions[2014/38]
French:Chaussure de patin ayant un couvre-orteils avec extensions arrière[2014/38]
Examination procedure15.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
13.10.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2016Fee for grant paid
10.02.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.02.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.10.2015
Opposition(s)07.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.11.2013
AL04.05.2016
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
BG04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
TR04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE25.11.2016
MT25.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU25.11.2013
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
BG04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
TR04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE25.11.2016
MT25.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/43]HU25.11.2013
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
BG04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE25.11.2016
MT25.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/38]HU25.11.2013
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
BG04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE25.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/30]HU25.11.2013
AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CY04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IS04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
MC04.05.2016
MK04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE25.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/50]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
IE25.11.2016
CH30.11.2016
FR30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/43]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SI04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
CH30.11.2016
LI30.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT04.05.2016
BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
SM04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE04.05.2016
CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
PL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
SK04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ04.05.2016
DK04.05.2016
EE04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RO04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK04.05.2016
ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
IT04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
GR05.08.2016
PT05.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES04.05.2016
FI04.05.2016
HR04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
LV04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
RS04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI04.05.2016
LT04.05.2016
NL04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT04.05.2016
NO04.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4351537  (SEIDEL SIGURD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 5,6,10;
 [XI]US2010156058  (KOYESS PHILIPPE [CA], et al) [X] 1,5,6,10,15 * the whole document * [I] 11-13;
 [XAI]US5342070  (MILLER DOUGLAS R [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * the whole document * [A] 13 [I] 5;
 [XI]CA2726580  (SPORT MASKA INC [CA]) [X] 1 * figures 1,7 * [I] 5;
 [XI]US2012011742  (YANG HSIN-CHIH [TW]) [X] 1,5,6,10 * the whole document * [I] 15;
 [X]CH658795  (GRAF & CO SPORTSCHUHFABRIK KRE) [X] 1,10,15 * the whole document *