Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2735515

EP2735515 - Apparatus for erecting carton blanks [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.08.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pester Pac Automation GmbH
Hauptstraße 50
87787 Wolfertschwenden / DE
[2014/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Haug, Hans
Am Meierhof, 12
D-87730 Bad Grönenbach / DE
 [2014/22]
Representative(s)Hutzelmann, Gerhard
Patentanwaltskanzlei Hutzelmann
Schloss Osterberg
89296 Osterberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/22]Hutzelmann, Gerhard
Patentanwaltskanzlei Hutzelmann Schloss Osterberg
89296 Osterberg / DE
Application number, filing date13194530.526.11.2013
[2014/22]
Priority number, dateDE20121011144926.11.2012         Original published format: DE102012111449
[2014/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2735515
Date:28.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:B65B43/18, B65B43/28, B65B7/20
[2014/22]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/22]
Extension statesBA01.09.2014
ME01.09.2014
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Aufrichten eines Faltschachtelzuschnittes[2014/22]
English:Apparatus for erecting carton blanks[2014/22]
French:Dispositif pour dresser un carton à partir d'un flan[2014/22]
Examination procedure18.06.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/41]
06.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.07.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.08.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.12.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2018Date of oral proceedings
17.07.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
17.07.2018Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination18.09.2018Appeal received No.  T0169/19
20.11.2018Statement of grounds filed
06.11.2019Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.03.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
15.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2616747  (SUPERPACK [FR]) [X] 1,6,11 * page 3, line 1 - page 9, line 8; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]US5027586  (RAMAKER DENNIS [US]) [X] 1-7,9,11,12 * column 4, line 49 - column 11, line 26; figure - *;
 [X]EP0398726  (S S A PACKAGING ENGINEERING & [AU], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,11,12 * column 6, line 31 - column 8, line 21; figures 3A-5A *;
 [X]WO8900132  (VISY BOARD CO PTY [AU]) [X] 1,5,6,11 * page 6, line 31 - page 10, line 22 *