blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2738207

EP2738207 - Preparation of rubber compositions containing syndiotactic polybutadiene filament and rubber composition and tire [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2016
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
200 Innovation Way
Akron, Ohio 44316 / US
[2014/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Sandstrom, Paul Harry
2065 Forest Edge Drive
Cuyahoga Falls, OH Ohio 44223 / US
 [2014/23]
Representative(s)Kutsch, Bernd
Goodyear S.A.
Patent Department
Avenue Gordon Smith
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
[2014/23]
Application number, filing date13194754.128.11.2013
[2014/23]
Priority number, dateUS20121368826429.11.2012         Original published format: US201213688264
[2014/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2738207
Date:04.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2738207
Date:04.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.03.2014
ClassificationIPC:C08L7/00, B60C1/00, C08L9/00
[2014/23]
CPC:
C08L9/00 (EP,US); C08L47/00 (US); B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,US); C08L2205/025 (US); C08L2205/03 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
Former [2014/23]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Herstellung von Kautschukzusammensetzungen enthaltend syndiotaktisches Polybutadien und Kautschukzusammensetzung und Reifen[2014/23]
English:Preparation of rubber compositions containing syndiotactic polybutadiene filament and rubber composition and tire[2014/23]
French:Préparation de compositions de caoutchouc contenant un filament de polybutadiène syndiotactique et composition de caoutchouc et pneu[2014/23]
Examination procedure04.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/03]
16.12.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2015Fee for grant paid
24.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.06.2015
Opposition(s)05.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.11.2013
AL04.11.2015
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
MT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
TR04.11.2015
IE28.11.2015
LU28.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU28.11.2013
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
MT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
TR04.11.2015
IE28.11.2015
LU28.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2018/32]HU28.11.2013
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MK04.11.2015
MT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
IE28.11.2015
LU28.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2018/02]HU28.11.2013
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
IE28.11.2015
LU28.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2017/39]HU28.11.2013
AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
BG04.11.2015
CY04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
MT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
IE28.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT04.11.2015
BE04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
IE28.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SI04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
IE28.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/45]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
IE28.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/42]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
MC04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
DK04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
SM04.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
EE04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RO04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
SK04.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT04.11.2015
CZ04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
LV04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT04.11.2015
ES04.11.2015
FI04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
PL04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
GR05.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
PT04.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES04.11.2015
HR04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
RS04.11.2015
SE04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NL04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
IS04.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
NO04.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES04.11.2015
LT04.11.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]US3778424  (HAMADA H, et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [X]US4215021  (ARAKI TAMIO [JP], et al) [X] 9-15 * examples 1-7; claims 1-4 *;
 [X]US4255296  (OGAWA MASAKI, et al) [X] 9-15 * examples 1-33 *;
 [X]US4257468  (OGAWA MASAKI, et al) [X] 9-15 * examples 1-10 *;
 [X]US4274462  (OGAWA MASAKI, et al) [X] 9-15 * examples 1-3; claims 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0170456  (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 9-15 * sample VII; page 32, line 27 - page 33, line 1; table 4 *;
 [A]US4645809  (BELL ANTHONY J [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1241219  (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1693411  (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 9-15 * paragraphs [0012] , [0035] , [0036]; examples 1,3; claims 1-13; tables 1-3 *;
 [A]JP2007002057  (UBE INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2007031568  (UBE INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2007155889  (OKAMOTO NAOMI [JP], et al) [A] 9-15 * examples 1-7; claims 1,13; tables 1-8 *
by applicantUS5307850
 US6956093
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.